Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
19.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
19.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
19.04.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
17.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
26.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.09.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 18.10.2023 [2023/42] |
12.04.2022 | Change - representative |