EP4075530 - ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT MATERIALS AND DEVICES
[Right-click to bookmark this link]
| Status | The patent has been granted
Status updated on 27.04.2024
Database last updated on 05.10.2024
| Former | Grant of patent is intended
Status updated on 20.12.2023
|
Former | Request for examination was made
Status updated on 16.09.2022
|
Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states
Universal Display Corporation
250 Phillips Boulevard
Ewing, NJ 08618
/ US
| [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMPSON, Nicholas J.
Ewing, NJ 08618
/ US
| 02 /
WEAVER, Michael S.
Ewing, NJ 08618
/ US
| 03 /
LIN, Chun
Ewing, NJ 08618
/ US
| [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München
/ DE
| [2024/22] | Former [2022/42] | Hansen, Norbert
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München
/ DE
|
Application number, filing date | 22167861.8 | 12.04.2022 | [2022/42] | Priority number, date | US202163174954P | 14.04.2021
Original published format: US 202163174954 P | US202217713141 | 04.04.2022
Original published format: US202217713141 | [2022/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type:
| A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4075530 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Type:
| B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4075530 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H10K50/11, H10K50/18, H10K50/155, H10K50/165, H10K50/17
| [2023/52] | CPC: |
H10K50/155 (EP);
H10K50/12 (KR);
H10K50/13 (CN);
H10K85/342 (KR,US);
H10K50/11 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/15 (CN,KR,US);
(+)
H10K50/16 (CN,KR,US);
H10K50/165 (EP);
H10K85/346 (KR,US);
H10K85/361 (KR);
H10K2101/10 (EP,US);
H10K2101/30 (EP,KR,US);
H10K2101/40 (US);
H10K2101/90 (EP);
H10K50/17 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H10K50/171 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H10K50/18 (EP,CN,KR,US)
(-)
| | Former IPC [2022/42] | H01L51/50 |
Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Title | German: | ORGANISCHE ELEKTROLUMINESZENTE MATERIALIEN UND VORRICHTUNGEN | [2022/42] | English: | ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT MATERIALS AND DEVICES | [2022/42] | French: | MATÉRIAUX ET DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTS ORGANIQUES | [2022/42] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2022 | Examination requested
[2022/42] | 23.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24178308.3 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court |
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
|
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
|
Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007231596
(SPINDLER JEFFREY P [US], et al); | | [X]EP3208861
(NOVALED GMBH [DE]); | | [I]US2020168818
(LIN CHUN [US], et al); | | [I]US2021036065
(ADAMOVICH VADIM [US], et al) | | by applicant | US4769292 | | US5061569 | | US5247190 | | JPH0773529 | | EP0650955 | | US5639914 | | US5703436 | | US5707745 | | KR0117693Y | | US5834893 | | US5844363 | | US6013982 | | US6087196 | | US6091195 | | US6097147 | | WO0139234 | | US2001019782 | | US6294398 | | US6303238 | | US6337102 | | WO0215645 | | US2002034656 | | US6413656 | | EP1239526 | | EP1244155 | | US6468819 | | US2002158242 | | US6517957 | | US2003068526 | | US2003072964 | | WO03040257 | | US2003138657 | | WO03060956 | | US2003162053 | | US2003175553 | | US6653654 | | US6656612 | | US2003230980 | | US6670645 | | JP2004022334 | | US6687266 | | US2004036077 | | US6699599 | | US2004174116 | | WO2004093207 | | US6835469 | | WO2005014551 | | WO2005019373 | | JP2005112765 | | US2005123788 | | US2005123791 | | US2005123751 | | JP2005149918 | | US2005139810 | | US6916554 | | US6921915 | | WO2005075451 | | WO2005089025 | | JP2005268199 | | US2005238919 | | US2005244673 | | CN1696137 | | US2005260449 | | US2006008670 | | US2006065890 | | EP1642951 | | EP1647554 | | WO2006056418 | | US2006127696 | | US2006134459 | | US2006134462 | | WO2006072002 | | WO2006081973 | | WO2006081780 | | US2006182993 | | WO2006095951 | | US2006202194 | | US2006240279 | | WO2006114966 | | US2006251923 | | WO2006121811 | | EP1725079 | | US2006280965 | | US7154114 | | US2007018155 | | US2007034863 | | WO2007018067 | | JP2007091719 | | US2007087321 | | US2007103060 | | US2007104979 | | US2007104980 | | US2007104977 | | US2007111026 | | WO2007063754 | | US2007138437 | | US2007145888 | | US2007160905 | | US2007181874 | | US2007190359 | | US2007224450 | | WO2007108362 | | US2007231600 | | JP2007254297 | | WO2007111263 | | US7279704 | | EP1841834 | | WO2007115970 | | WO2007115981 | | US2007252140 | | WO2007125714 | | US2007278936 | | US2007278938 | | US2008014464 | | US2008020237 | | JP2008021687 | | US7332232 | | WO2008023550 | | WO2008023759 | | WO2008035571 | | US2008091025 | | WO2008054584 | | US2008106190 | | US2008107919 | | WO2008056746 | | US7378162 | | US2008124572 | | US2008145707 | | US2008161567 | | WO2008078800 | | WO2008096609 | | WO2008101842 | | US2008210930 | | US2008220265 | | US2008233410 | | US2008233434 | | US7431968 | | US2008261076 | | US2008297033 | | US2008303417 | | WO2009000673 | | WO2009003898 | | WO2009003455 | | US2009017330 | | WO2009008277 | | WO2009011327 | | US2009030202 | | EP2020694 | | US2009039776 | | WO2009021126 | | EP2034538 | | US2009066235 | | US2009085476 | | US2009104472 | | WO2009050281 | | US2009101870 | | US2009108737 | | EP1841834 | | US2009115322 | | US2009115320 | | US2009115316 | | US7534505 | | WO2009063833 | | EP2062907 | | WO2009066778 | | WO2009066779 | | US2009140637 | | US2009167162 | | US2009167161 | | US2009167167 | | WO2009086028 | | US2009179555 | | US2009179554 | | EP2085382 | | WO2009100991 | | US2009218940 | | WO2009145016 | | US2009302743 | | WO2009148269 | | US2009309488 | | US2010012931 | | US7675228 | | WO2010028151 | | US2010084966 | | US2010090591 | | US2010102716 | | US2010105902 | | US2010108990 | | WO2010054731 | | WO2010056066 | | US7728137 | | WO2010061824 | | JP4478555B | | US2010148663 | | WO2010067894 | | US7740957 | | WO2010072300 | | KR20100079458 | | US7759489 | | US2010187984 | | WO2010086089 | | WO2010107244 | | US2010244004 | | WO2010118029 | | US2010270916 | | US2010288362 | | US2010295032 | | US2011007385 | | US2011037057 | | US2011057559 | | WO2011044988 | | WO2011051404 | | US2011108822 | | US7951947 | | WO2011075644 | | WO2011074770 | | US7968146 | | US2011156017 | | WO2011081423 | | WO2011081431 | | US2011163302 | | WO2011086863 | | KR20110088898 | | US2011204333 | | US2011210320 | | WO2011105373 | | US2011215710 | | WO2011107491 | | US2011227049 | | US2011240968 | | TW201139402 | | US2011278551 | | US2011285275 | | US8067099 | | WO2012020327 | | US2012075273 | | KR20120032054 | | JP2012074444 | | US2012126221 | | US2012146012 | | US2012193612 | | KR20120088644 | | US2012205642 | | US2012214993 | | WO2012128298 | | CN102702075 | | WO2012133644 | | WO2012133649 | | US2012292601 | | KR20120129733 | | WO2012163471 | | WO2012177006 | | US2013009543 | | US2013033172 | | WO2013018530 | | WO2013024872 | | WO2013035275 | | WO2013039073 | | US8415031 | | DE102012005215 | | KR20130043460 | | US2013105787 | | JP2013110263 | | WO2013081315 | | WO2013079217 | | US2013146848 | | WO2013087142 | | US2013165653 | | WO2013094620 | | KR20130077473 | | US2013175519 | | TW201329200 | | US2013181190 | | WO2013107487 | | WO2013118812 | | TW201332980 | | WO2013120577 | | US2013241401 | | KR20130108183 | | WO2013145667 | | US8557400 | | KR20130115564 | | WO2013157367 | | EP2660300 | | US8592586 | | WO2013174471 | | WO2013175747 | | WO2013180376 | | US2013334521 | | WO2013191404 | | US2014001446 | | WO2014002873 | | WO2014007565 | | CN103508940 | | EP2684932 | | WO2014008982 | | US2014014925 | | US2014014927 | | WO2014009310 | | JP2014009196 | | WO2014015935 | | WO2014015937 | | US2014034914 | | WO2014023377 | | WO2014024131 | | WO2014031977 | | WO2014030872 | | WO2014030921 | | WO2014034791 | | WO2014038456 | | CN103694277 | | US2014103305 | | US2014117329 | | EP2730583 | | US2014183503 | | US2014183517 | | WO2014104514 | | WO2014104499 | | WO2014104535 | | EP2757608 | | WO2014112450 | | US2014225088 | | US2014246656 | | WO2014142472 | | US2014284580 | | WO2014157018 | | US8871361 | | US2015060804 | | US2015123047 | | US2016163995 | | US9466803 | | US2017263869 | | EP20010239526 | | EP20010624500 | | EP20010698613 | | EP20010806334 | | EP20020055700 | | EP20020055701 | | EP20010602648 | | EP20010734038 | | EP20010617493 | | EP20010930964 | | EP20010961743 | | EP20010956007 | | EP20010968131 | | EP20010972613 | | EP20010997799 | | EP20020011790 | | WO2007US23098 | | WO2009US42829 | | KR20090133652 |
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.