EP4079677 - DEVICE FOR EQUIPPING A HORSE RIDING SADDLE FOR PROTECTING THE STIRRUP LEATHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fournier, Yan 42 Rue de l'Evêché 2ème Arrondissement 13002 Marseille / FR | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Hautier IP 20, rue de la Liberté 06000 Nice / FR | [2023/36] |
Former [2022/43] | Hautier IP - MC/EP 20, rue de la Liberté 06000 Nice / FR | Application number, filing date | 22168379.0 | 14.04.2022 | [2022/43] | Priority number, date | FR20210004245 | 23.04.2021 Original published format: FR 2104245 | [2022/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4079677 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4079677 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B68C1/16, B68C3/00 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
B68C1/16 (EP);
B68C3/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] |
Former [2022/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSRÜSTUNG EINES REITSATTELS ZUM SCHUTZ DER STEIGBÜGELRIEMEN | [2022/43] | English: | DEVICE FOR EQUIPPING A HORSE RIDING SADDLE FOR PROTECTING THE STIRRUP LEATHER | [2022/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉQUIPEMENT DE SELLE D'ÉQUITATION POUR PROTÉGER LES ÉTRIVIÈRES | [2022/43] | Examination procedure | 09.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/15] | 09.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 06.09.2023 | |
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 06.09.2023 | |
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 06.09.2023 | |
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 06.12.2023 | |
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US909385 (FACHIRI ANTONIO PANDELLI [GB]) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 8 - page 2, line 36 * * figures 1-4 ** claims 1-8 *; | [A]KR20150004667U (JAE C O) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0054] * * figures 1-7 * * claims 1-11 * |