EP4260757 - CLEANING DEVICE, SWEEPING BRUSH FOR A CLEANING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A CLEANING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 05.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | 05.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | 05.04.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vorwerk & Co. Interholding GmbH Mühlenweg 17-37 42275 Wuppertal / DE | [2023/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fröhlich, Hannes 42105 Wuppertal / DE | [2023/42] | Representative(s) | Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 22168497.0 | 14.04.2022 | [2023/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4260757 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A46B3/14, A46B5/00, A46B7/04, A46B13/00 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
A46B3/14 (EP);
A47L11/4036 (CN);
A46B13/00 (CN);
A46B13/008 (EP);
A46B13/02 (CN);
A46B5/0095 (EP);
A46B7/04 (CN);
A46B7/042 (EP);
A47L11/24 (CN);
A47L11/4094 (CN);
A46B2200/30 (EP);
A46B2200/3033 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] |
Former [2023/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSGERÄT, KEHRBÜRSTE FÜR EIN REINIGUNGSGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES REINIGUNGSGERÄTS | [2023/42] | English: | CLEANING DEVICE, SWEEPING BRUSH FOR A CLEANING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A CLEANING DEVICE | [2023/42] | French: | APPAREIL DE NETTOYAGE, BROSSE DE BALAYAGE POUR UN APPAREIL DE NETTOYAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN APPAREIL DE NETTOYAGE | [2023/42] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/19] | 28.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2578125 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15* Figuren 8-10 *; | [XDI]EP3443863 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [XD] 1,13 * Figuren, Absatz 9 * [I] 2-12,14,15; | [XDI]DE102017119216 (VORWERK CO INTERHOLDING [DE]) [XD] 1,13 * Figuren 9, 10, Absatz 13 * [I] 2-12,14,15 | by applicant | DE102010037672 | EP3443863 | DE102017119216 |