Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
26.07.2024 | First examination report | |
27.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.12.2023 | Change - representative | |
18.10.2023 | Change - representative | |
19.05.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
19.05.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
19.05.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
17.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
10.02.2023 | Change - applicant | published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] |
14.10.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
25.04.2022 | Change - representative | |
19.04.2022 | Change - representative |