EP4088995 - BICYCLE CHILD SEATING SYSTEM AND COMPONENTS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.04.2024 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kids Ride Shotgun Limited 1 Rutherford Street Otumoetai 3110 Tauranga / NZ | [2022/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Munro, Stuart Gregory 3116 Mount Maunganui / NZ | 02 /
Hayward, Thomas Charles 3116 Mount Maunganui / NZ | [2022/46] | Representative(s) | ip21 Ltd Central Formalities Department Suite 2 The Old Dairy Elm Farm Business Park Wymondham Norwich, Norfolk NR18 0SW / GB | [2022/46] | Application number, filing date | 22168954.0 | 20.04.2022 | [2022/46] | Priority number, date | AU20210901160 | 20.04.2021 Original published format: AU 2021901160 | [2022/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4088995 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4088995 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B62J1/16, B62J1/08, B62J1/28, B62J25/06, F16B2/18, // F16B7/14 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
B62J1/167 (EP,US);
B62J1/08 (EP,US);
B62J1/28 (EP);
B62J25/06 (EP,US);
F16B2/185 (EP);
B62K2206/00 (EP);
F16B7/1454 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/39] |
Former [2022/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRRADKINDERSATTELSYSTEM UND KOMPONENTEN DAVON | [2022/46] | English: | BICYCLE CHILD SEATING SYSTEM AND COMPONENTS THEREOF | [2022/46] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SIÈGE DE BICYCLETTE POUR ENFANT ET SES COMPOSANTS | [2024/20] |
Former [2022/46] | SYSTÈME DE SIÈGE POUR ENFANTS DE BICYCLETTE ET SES COMPOSANTS | Examination procedure | 22.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/39] | 22.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE374887 (FRANZ ADE, et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2443086 (LOCT LTD [GB]) [A] 1-14 * figures 4-13 * * page 6, line 9 - page 14, line 24 *; | [A]CN207015486U (FENG XUNZHAN) [A] 1-14* figures 1-9 *; | [A]US2020277013 (KANG ZHIFENG [CN]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |