EP4105453 - TURBINE SHROUD ASSEMBLY WITH FORWARD AND AFT PIN SHROUD ATTACHMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce Corporation 450 South Meridian Street Indianapolis, Indiana 46225 / US | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREEMAN, Ted J. Indianapolis, Indiana 46225 / US | 02 /
SIPPEL, Aaron D. Indianapolis, Indiana 46225 / US | 03 /
THOMAS, David J. Indianapolis, Indiana 46225 / US | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/51] | Application number, filing date | 22169263.5 | 21.04.2022 | [2022/51] | Priority number, date | US202117351471 | 18.06.2021 Original published format: US202117351471 | [2022/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4105453 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/24, F01D11/08 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
F01D25/246 (EP,US);
F01D11/08 (EP,US);
F01D25/243 (US);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2220/323 (EP);
F05D2230/51 (EP);
F05D2230/642 (EP,US);
F05D2240/11 (EP,US);
F05D2260/31 (EP);
F05D2260/311 (EP);
F05D2260/36 (EP,US);
F05D2300/50212 (US);
F05D2300/6033 (EP,US);
F16B19/02 (US);
F16J15/166 (US);
Y02T50/60 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] |
Former [2022/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TURBINENDECKBANDANORDNUNG MIT VORDERER UND HINTERER MANTELBEFESTIGUNG MIT STIFTEN | [2022/51] | English: | TURBINE SHROUD ASSEMBLY WITH FORWARD AND AFT PIN SHROUD ATTACHMENT | [2022/51] | French: | ENSEMBLE CARÉNAGE DE TURBINE AVEC FIXATION DE CARÉNAGE À BROCHES AVANT ET ARRIÈRE | [2022/51] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/28] | 05.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US2010104426 (KELLER DOUGLAS A [US], et al); | [XAY]EP3043032 (ROLLS ROYCE NAM TECH INC [US]); | [A]EP3178799 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [XAY]US2018195403 (KERNS DANIEL PATRICK [US], et al) |