EP4265718 - NOVEL SINGLE-SUBUNIT RNA POLYMERASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universität Hamburg Mittelweg 177 20148 Hamburg / DE | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Streit, Wolfgang 24248 Moenkeberg / DE | 02 /
Han, Yuchen 22607 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
Kinfu, Birhanu 24103 Kiel / DE | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Stüven, Ralf RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Kirchenhang 32b 21073 Hamburg / DE | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 22169518.2 | 22.04.2022 | [2023/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4265718 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/12 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
C12N9/1247 (EP);
C12P19/34 (EP);
C12Y207/07006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE EINSEITIGE RNA-POLYMERASE | [2023/43] | English: | NOVEL SINGLE-SUBUNIT RNA POLYMERASE | [2023/43] | French: | NOUVELLE POLYMÉRASE À ARN DOTÉE D'UNE SEULE SOUS-UNITÉ | [2023/43] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/41] | 04.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2020243026 (PRIMORDIAL GENETICS INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * sequence 12 * * page 29 - page 31; tables 2,3 *; | [I] - Dabrowski F. ET AL, "Full=DNA-directed RNA polymerase {ECO:0000256|ARBA:ARBA00012418}", UNIPROT, (20150304), Database accession no. A0A0A6Z5B7, XP055968063 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | [I] - GUREVICH VSEVOLOD V ET AL, "Preparative mRNA synthesis using SP6 and T7 RNA polymerases", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (19910101), vol. 195, pages 207 - 213, XP055968616 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4952496 | US5385834 | US11236311 | - NANCE K.D.MEIER J.L., "Modifications in an Emergency: The Role of N1-Methylpseudouridine in COVID-19 Vaccines", ACS Cent. Sci., (20210000), vol. 7, no. 5, pages 748 - 756 | - NOTREDAME, C.HIGGINS, D.G.HERINGA, J., "T-coffee: a novel method for fast and accurate multiple sequence alignment", Journal of Molecular Biology, (20000000), vol. 302, no. 3, doi:10.1006/jmbi.2000.4042, pages 205 - 217, XP004469125 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.2000.4042 | - STEPHEN F. ALTSCHULTHOMAS L. MADDENALEJANDRO A. SCHAFFERJINGHUI ZHANGZHENG ZHANGWEBB MILLERDAVID J. LIPMAN, Nucleic Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - STEPHEN F. ALTSCHULJOHN C. WOOTTONE. MICHAEL GERTZRICHA AGARWALAALEKSANDR MORGULISALEJANDRO A. SCHAFFERYI-KUO YU, FEBS J., (20050000), vol. 272, pages 5101 - 5109 | - GOLYNSKIY MVHAUGNER JC 3RDMORELLI AMORRONE DSEELIG B, "In vitro evolution of enzymes", Methods Mol Biol., (20130000), vol. 978, pages 73 - 92 | - "NCBI", Database accession no. P06221 | - BORKOTOKY, S.MURALI, A., "The highly efficient T7 RNA polymerase: A wonder macromolecule in biological realm", International Journal of Biological Macromolecules, (20180000), vol. 118, doi:10.1016/j.ijbiomac.2018.05.198, pages 49 - 56, XP085440480 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijbiomac.2018.05.198 | - "A rapid and sensitive method for the quantitation of microgram quantities of protein utilizing the principle of protein-dye binding", BRADFORD, M.M., Analytical Biochemistry, (19760000), vol. 72, pages 248 - 254 | - BUSCHER, N., SAYOGA, G.V., RIIBSAM, K., JAKOB, F., SCHWANEBERG, U., KARA, S., AND LIESE, A., "Biocatalyst immobilization by anchor peptides on an additively manufacturable materia", Organic Process Research & Development, (20190000), vol. 23, pages 1852 - 1859 | - CHEETHAM, G.M.T.JERUZALMI, D.STEITZ, T.A., "Structural basis for initiation of transcription from an RNA polymerase-promoter complex", Nature, (19990000), vol. 399, pages 80 - 83 | - DANSO, D.SCHMEISSER, C.CHOW, J.ZIMMERMANN, W.WEI, R.LEGGEWIE, C.LI, X.HAZEN, T.STREIT, W.R., Applied and Environmental Microbiology, (20180000), vol. 84, pages e02773 - 02717 | - EDDY, S.R., "Accelerated Profile HMM Searches", PLoS Comput Biol, (20110000), vol. 7, page e1002195 | - EKKERS, D.M.CRETOIU, M.S.KIELAK, A.M.ELSAS, J.D., "The great screen anomaly--a new frontier in product discovery through functional metagenomics", Appl Microbiol Biotechnol, (20120000), vol. 93, doi:10.1007/s00253-011-3804-3, pages 1005 - 1020, XP035006066 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-011-3804-3 | - FERRER, M.MARTINEZ-MARTINEZ, M.BARGIELA, R.STREIT, W.R.GOLYSHINA, O.V.GOLYSHIN, P.N., "Estimating the success of enzyme bioprospecting through metagenomics: current status and future trends", Microbial Biotechnology, (20160000), vol. 9, pages 22 - 34 | - GABOR, E.M.ALKEMA, W.B.JANSSEN, D.B., "Quantifying the accessibility of the metagenome by random expression cloning techniques", Environmental microbiology, (20040000), vol. 6, doi:10.1111/j.1462-2920.2004.00640.x, pages 879 - 886, XP002381571 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1462-2920.2004.00640.x | - GRIMM, A.R.SAUER, D.F.MIRZAEI GARAKANI, T.RIIBSAM, K.POLEN, T.DAVARI, M.D.JAKOB, F.SCHIFFELS, J.OKUDA, J.SCHWANEBERG, U., "Anchor peptide-mediated surface immobilization of a Grubbs-Hoveyda-type catalyst for ring-opening metathesis polymerization", Bioconjugate Chemistry, (20190000), vol. 30, pages 714 - 720 | - "Metagenomic screening of a novel PET esterase via in vitro expression system", HAN, Y.DIERKES, R.F.STREIT, W.R., Metagenomics: Methods and Protocols, NY: Springer | - ILMBERGER, N.GULLERT, S.DANNENBERG, J.RABAUSCH, U.TORRES, J.WEMHEUER, B.ALAWI, M.POEHLEIN, A.CHOW, J.TURAEV, D., "A comparative metagenome survey of the fecal microbiota of a breast- and a plant-fed Asian elephant reveals an unexpectedly high diversity of glycoside hydrolase family enzymes", PLoS One, (20140000), vol. 9, page e106707 | - ILMBERGER, N.MESKE, D.JUERGENSEN, J.SCHULTE, M.BARTHEN, P.RABAUSCH, U.ANGELOV, A.MIENTUS, M.LIEBL, W.SCHMITZ, R.A., "Metagenomic cellulases highly tolerant towards the presence of ionic liquids-linking thermostability and halotolerance", Applied Microbiology and Biotechnology, (20120000), vol. 95, doi:10.1007/s00253-011-3732-2, pages 135 - 146, XP035065848 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-011-3732-2 | - JOO, S.CHO, I.J.SEO, H.SON, H.F.SAGONG, H.-Y.SHIN, T.J.CHOI, S.Y.LEE, S.Y.KIM, K.-J., "Structural insight into molecular mechanism of poly(ethylene terephthalate) degradation", Nature Communications, (20180000), vol. 9, page 382 | - JORGENSEN, E.D.DURBIN, R.K.RISMAN, S.S.MCALLISTER, W.T., "Specific contacts between the bacteriophage T3, T7, and SP6 RNA polymerases and their promoters", Journal of Biological Chemistry, (19910000), vol. 266, pages 645 - 651 | - KINFU, B.M.JAHNKE, M.JANUS, M.BESIRLIOGLU, V.ROGGENBUCK, M.MEURER, R.VOJCIC, L.BORCHERT, M.SCHWANEBERG, U.CHOW, J., "Recombinant RNA polymerase from Geobacillus sp. GHH01 as tool for rapid generation of metagenomic RNAs using in vitro technologies", Biotechnology and Bioengineering, (20170000), vol. 114, doi:10.1002/bit.26436, pages 2739 - 2752, XP055517853 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.26436 | - KORFER, G.PITZLER, C.VOJCIC, L.MARTINEZ, R.SCHWANEBERG, U., "In vitro flow cytometry-based screening platform for cellulase engineering", Scientific Reports, (20160000), vol. 6, doi:10.1038/srep26128, page 26128, XP055327607 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep26128 | - KWON, Y.-C.JEWETT, M.C, "High-throughput preparation methods of crude extract for robust cell-free protein synthesis", Scientific Reports, (20150000), vol. 5, doi:10.1038/srep08663, page 8663, XP055291919 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep08663 | - LAM, K.N.CHENG, J.ENGEL, K.NEUFELD, J.D.CHARLES, T.C., "Current and future resources for functional metagenomics", Frontiers in Microbiology, (20150000), vol. 6 | - LEHMANN, C.SIBILLA, F.MAUGERI, Z.STREIT, W.R.DE MARIA, P.D.MARTINEZ, R.SCHWANEBERG, U., "Reengineering CelA2 cellulase for hydrolysis in aqueous solutions of deep eutectic solvents and concentrated seawater", Green Chemistry, (20120000), vol. 14, pages 2719 - 2726 | - MARKEL, U., ESSANI, K.D., BESIRLIOGLU, V., SCHIFFELS, J., STREIT, W.R., AND SCHWANEBERG, U., "Advances in ultrahigh-throughput screening for directed enzyme evolution", Chemical Society Reviews, (20200000), vol. 49, pages 233 - 262 | - MARTINO, C.KIM, S.H.HORSFALL, L.ABBASPOURRAD, A.ROSSER, S.J.COOPER, J.WEITZ, D.A., "Protein expression, aggregation, and triggered release from polymersomes as artificial cell-like structures", Angewandte Chemie, (20120000), vol. 51, doi:10.1002/anie.201201443, pages 6416 - 6420, XP055336909 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201201443 | - MASTROBATTISTA, E.TALY, V.CHANUDET, E.TREACY, P.KELLY, B.T.GRIFFITHS, A.D., "High-throughput screening of enzyme libraries: in vitro evolution of a beta-galactosidase by fluorescence-activated sorting of double emulsions", Chemistry & Biology, (20050000), vol. 12, doi:10.1016/j.chembiol.2005.09.016, pages 1291 - 1300, XP055251876 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chembiol.2005.09.016 | - NAKAMURA, A.KOBAYASHI, N.KOGA, N.LINO, R., "Positive charge introduction on the surface of thermostabilized PET hydrolase facilitates PET binding and degradation", ACS Catalysis, (20210000), vol. 11, pages 8550 - 8564 | - PEDELACQ, J.D.CABANTOUS, S.TRAN, T.TERWILLIGER, T.C.WALDO, G.S., "Engineering and characterization of a superfolder green fluorescent protein", Nature Biotechnology, (20060000), vol. 24, doi:10.1038/nbt1172, pages 79 - 88, XP037245859 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1172 | - "Chapter Seven - Exploring the global metagenome for plastic-degrading enzymes", PEREZ-GARCIA, P.DANSO, D.ZHANG, H.CHOW, J.STREIT, W.R., Methods in Enzymology, U.T. Bornscheuer & R. Wei. Academic Press, (20210000), pages 137 - 157 | - "Emerging Fields in Functional Metagenomics and Its Industrial Relevance: Overcoming Limitations and Redirecting the Search for Novel Biocatalysts", PERNER, M.ILMBERGER, N.KOHLER, H.U.CHOW, J.STREIT, W.R., Handbook of Molecular Microbial Ecology, John Wiley & Sons, (20110000), pages 481 - 498 | - QIU, L.YIN, X.LIU, T.ZHANG, H.CHEN, G.WU, S., "Biodegradation of bis(2-hydroxyethyl) terephthalate by a newly isolated Enterobacter sp. HY1 and characterization of its esterase properties", Journal of Basic Microbiology, (20200000), vol. 60, pages 699 - 711 | - RIIBSAM, K.STOMPS, B.BOKER, A.JAKOB, F.SCHWANEBERG, U., "Anchor peptides: A green and versatile method for polypropylene functionalization", Polymer, (20170000), vol. 116, doi:10.1016/j.polymer.2017.03.070, pages 124 - 132, XP029987715 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.polymer.2017.03.070 | - STEELE, H.L.AEGER, K.E.DANIEL, R.STREIT, W.R., "Advances in recovery of novel biocatalysts from metagenomes", J Mol Microbiol Biotechnol, (20090000), vol. 16, pages 25 - 37 | - STREIT, W.R.SCHMITZ, R.A., "Metagenomics - the key to the uncultured microbes", Current Opinion in Microbiology, (20040000), vol. 7, doi:10.1016/j.mib.2004.08.002, pages 492 - 498, XP004586486 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mib.2004.08.002 | - TAMURA, K.STECHER, G.PETERSON, D.FILIPSKI, A.KUMAR, S., "MEGA6: molecular evolutionary genetics analysis version 6.0.", Molecular Biology and Evolution, (20130000), vol. 30, pages 2725 - 2729 | - UCHIYAMA, T.MIYAZAKI, K., "Functional metagenomics for enzyme discovery: challenges to efficient screening", Current Opinion in Biotechnology, (20090000), vol. 20, doi:10.1016/j.copbio.2009.09.010, pages 616 - 622, XP026778870 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.copbio.2009.09.010 | - UPPENBERG, J.HANSEN, M.T.PATKAR, S.JONES, T.A., "The sequence, crystal structure determination and refinement of two crystal forms of lipase B from Candida antarctica", Structure, (19940000), vol. 2, doi:10.1016/S0969-2126(00)00031-9, pages 293 - 308, XP024247919 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0969-2126(00)00031-9 | - ZHANG, H.PEREZ-GARCIA, P.DIERKES, R.F.APPLEGATE, V.SCHUMACHER, J.CHIBANI, C.M.STERNAGEL, S.PREUSS, L.WEIGERT, S.SCHMEISSER, C., "The Bacteroidetes Aequorivita sp. and Kaistella jeonii produce promiscuous esterases with PET-hydrolyzing activity", Frontiers in Microbiology, (20220000), vol. 12 |