Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11927009 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2024 | B2 | US2020087913 | 19.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018IN50205 | 10.04.2018 | IN201741018271 | 24.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3631115 | Global Dossier | 29.06.2022 | B1 | EP3631115 | 10.03.2021 | A4 | EP3631115 | 08.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018IN50205 | 10.04.2018 | IN201741018271 | 24.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110832150 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018IN50205 | 10.04.2018 | IN201741018271 | 24.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3063992 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2023 | C | CA3063992 | 29.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018IN50205 | 10.04.2018 | IN201741018271 | 24.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4194636 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18805541 | 10.04.2018 | WO2018IN50205 | 10.04.2018 | IN201741018271 | 24.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3631115T | 15.08.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2018IN50205 | 10.04.2018 | IN201741018271 | 24.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2925636T | 19.10.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2018IN50205 | 10.04.2018 | IN201741018271 | 24.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3631115T | 03.10.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2018IN50205 | 10.04.2018 | IN201741018271 | 24.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS63584 | 31.10.2022 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP18805541 | 10.04.2018 | WO2018IN50205 | 10.04.2018 | IN201741018271 | 24.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI3631115T | 28.10.2022 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP18805541 | 10.04.2018 | WO2018IN50205 | 10.04.2018 | IN201741018271 | 24.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201907937 | 26.01.2022 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2018IN50205 | 10.04.2018 | IN201741018271 | 24.05.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018216028 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IN201741018271 | 24.05.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE059442T | 28.11.2022 | T2 | Priority number | Date | IN201741018271 | 24.05.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3631115T | 20.09.2022 | T | Priority number | Date | IN201741018271 | 24.05.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI799418B | 21.04.2023 | B | TW201900992 | 01.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | IN201741018271 | 24.05.2017 | Type | Earlier application | EP3631115 |