EP4082811 - PRIME MOVER LOAD CONTROL ON MULTI-SPEED GENERATOR SET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thermo King LLC 314 West 90th Street Minneapolis, MN 55420 / US | [2023/18] |
Former [2022/44] | For all designated states Thermo King Corporation 314 West 90th Street Minneapolis, MN 55420 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMPSON, John G Inver Grove Heights, Minnesota, 55076 / US | 02 /
BURNHAM, Randy S St. Michael, Minnesota, 55376 / US | 03 /
GLEASON, Kyle J Burnsville, Minnesota, 55337 / US | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/44] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 22170372.1 | 27.04.2022 | [2022/44] | Priority number, date | US202163182289P | 30.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163182289 P | [2022/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4082811 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00, B60H1/32, H02P9/04 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
B60H1/3232 (EP,US);
F02D31/007 (US);
B60H1/00364 (US);
B60H1/00428 (US);
B60H1/3222 (EP);
F02D29/06 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] |
Former [2022/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LASTSTEUERUNG EINER ANTRIEBSMASCHINE EINES MEHRGANGGENERATORSATZES | [2022/44] | English: | PRIME MOVER LOAD CONTROL ON MULTI-SPEED GENERATOR SET | [2022/44] | French: | COMMANDE DE CHARGE DE MOTEUR PRINCIPAL SUR UN ENSEMBLE DE GÉNÉRATEURS MULTI-VITESSES | [2022/44] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 28.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014144164 (STEELE JOHN T [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015000636 (STOCKBRIDGE MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015330321 (LUCHT ERICH ALBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2020207184 (SCHUMACHER RYAN WAYNE [US], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document * |