EP4056959 - MAGNETIC-INDUCTIVE FLOW METER AND MEASURING POINT USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endress+Hauser Flowtec AG Kägenstrasse 7 4153 Reinach / CH | [2024/41] |
Former [2022/37] | For all designated states Endress + Hauser Flowtec AG Kägenstrasse 7 4153 Reinach / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mariager, Simon 4059 Basel / CH | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | Penner, Paul Endress + Hauser Group Services (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Straße 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [2022/37] | Application number, filing date | 22170682.3 | 07.03.2019 | [2022/37] | Priority number, date | DE201810108197 | 06.04.2018 Original published format: DE102018108197 | [2022/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4056959 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/58, G01F25/10 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
G01F1/58 (EP,US);
G01F1/584 (US);
G01F25/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] |
Former [2022/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MAGNETISCH-INDUKTIVES DURCHFLUSSMESSGERÄT UND MESSSTELLE MIT EINEM SOLCHEN MAGNETISCH-INDUKTIVEN DURCHFLUSSMESSGERÄT | [2022/37] | English: | MAGNETIC-INDUCTIVE FLOW METER AND MEASURING POINT USING THE SAME | [2022/37] | French: | DÉBITMÈTRE MAGNÉTIQUE À INDUCTION ET POINT DE MESURE DOTÉ D'UN TEL DÉBITMÈTRE | [2022/37] | Examination procedure | 22.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 22.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19709906.2 / EP3775791 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE1227677 (ECKARDT AG J) [Y] 9 * column 1, line 13 - line 17 * [A] 1-8,10-12; | [IY]US6094992 (MESCH FRANZ [DE], et al) [I] 1-8,10-12 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 9 - line 50 * [Y] 9; | [A]US2010107776 (SHANAHAN BRET A [US]) [A] 1-12 * figures 1, 2 ** paragraphs [0038] , [0 39] , [0 42] , [0 60] , [0 61] *; | [A]DE102011079352 (FLOWTEC AG [CH]) [A] 1-12 * figure 3 * * paragraphs [0032] , [0 33] *; | [A]WO2017025314 (ENDRESS & HAUSER FLOWTEC AG [CH]) [A] 1-12 * figures 1, 3, 16 * * page 9, line 29 - line 36 * | by applicant | EP0878694 | CN101294832 | DE102014113408 | DE102015113390 |