EP4091554 - MULTI-MODAL PATIENT-SPECIFIC SURGICAL GUIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wright Medical Technology, Inc. 1023 Cherry Road Memphis, TN 38117 / US | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALSPAUGH, Julia C. Memphis, 38111 / US | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 22170782.1 | 29.04.2022 | [2022/47] | Priority number, date | US202163201950P | 20.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163201950 P | US202163223224P | 19.07.2021 Original published format: US 202163223224 P | US202217660931 | 27.04.2022 Original published format: US202217660931 | [2022/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4091554 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4091554 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/15, A61B17/17, B22F5/10, B33Y80/00, // A61B34/10 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
A61B17/1775 (EP,US);
A61B17/1703 (US);
A61B17/15 (EP);
A61B17/1739 (EP);
B22F5/10 (EP);
B33Y80/00 (EP);
A61B2017/00526 (US);
A61B2017/568 (EP,US);
A61B2034/105 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/47] | A61B17/15, A61B17/17 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/13] |
Former [2022/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTIMODALE PATIENTENSPEZIFISCHE CHIRURGISCHE FÜHRUNGEN | [2022/47] | English: | MULTI-MODAL PATIENT-SPECIFIC SURGICAL GUIDES | [2022/47] | French: | GUIDES CHIRURGICAUX MULTIMODAUX SPÉCIFIQUES AU PATIENT | [2022/47] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 19.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2009087276 (ROSE BRYAN [US]) [I] 1-4,6-8,10 * paragraphs [0302] , [0303] , [0362] - [0364]; figures 31-32,58-60 * [Y] 5,9; | [Y]EP2742878 (WRIGHT MEDICAL TECH INC [US]) [Y] 5,9 * paragraphs [0023] , [0028]; figures 8A-8C *; | [IY]US2014257304 (EASH CHRISTOPHER [US]) [I] 1-4,6-8,10 * paragraphs [0023] , [0027] - [0033]; figures 1-5 * [Y] 5,9; | [XY]US2015142000 (SEEDHOM BAHAA [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,10 * paragraphs [0092] - [0096] - [0120] , [0128] - [0131] - [0145] , [0146]; figures 1-4,14,19,20 * [Y] 5,9; | [A]US2019117237 (WHITE DERRICK [GB], et al) [A] 1* paragraphs [0160] , [0161]; figures 1a-1f * | by applicant | US5768134 | US8808297 | US8808303 | US9017334 | US9113914 | US9918724 | US10413308 |