EP4061020 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MAPPING FIRST AND SECOND INPUT CHANNELS TO AT LEAST ONE OUTPUT CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herre, Jürgen 91058 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Küch, Fabian 91058 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
Kratschmer, Michael 91058 Erlangen / DE | 04 /
Kuntz, Achim 91058 Erlangen / DE | 05 /
Faller, Christof 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Stöckeler, Ferdinand, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 22170897.7 | 15.07.2014 | [2022/38] | Priority number, date | EP20130177360 | 22.07.2013 Original published format: EP 13177360 | EP20130189243 | 18.10.2013 Original published format: EP 13189243 | [2022/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4061020 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04S7/00, H04S3/00, // G10L19/008 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
H04S3/002 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
H04S7/00 (RU);
H04S7/30 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
H04S7/303 (US);
G10L19/00 (RU);
G10L19/008 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
H04R5/02 (US);
H04S3/008 (RU);
H04S3/02 (US);
H04S7/302 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04S7/305 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04S7/308 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] |
Former [2022/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ZUORDNUNG EINES ERSTEN UND EINES ZWEITEN EINGABEKANALS ZU MINDESTENS EINEM AUSGABEKANAL | [2022/38] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MAPPING FIRST AND SECOND INPUT CHANNELS TO AT LEAST ONE OUTPUT CHANNEL | [2022/38] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN CORRESPONDANCE D'UN PREMIER ET D'UN SECOND CANAL D'ENTRÉE AVEC AU MOINS UN CANAL DE SORTIE | [2022/38] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 28.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14738861.5 / EP3025518 | EP17184927.6 / EP3258710 | EP19162579.7 / EP3518563 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010012478 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al); | [A]WO2011152044 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al); | [A]WO2012109019 (DOLBY LAB LICENSING CORP [US], et al); |