EP4074702 - CRYSTALLINE FORMS OF 6-[2-(METHYLCARBAMOYL)PHENYLSULFANYL]-3-E-[2-(PYRIDIN-2-YL)ETHENYL]INDAZOLE SUITABLE FOR THE TREATMENT OF ABNORMAL CELL GROWTH IN MAMMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Products Inc. Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAMPETA, Anthony, Michael Groton, CT 06340 / US | 02 /
CHEKAL, Brian, Patrick Groton, CT 06340 / US | 03 /
MCLAUGHLING, Robert, William Groton, CT 06340 / US | 04 /
SINGER, Robert, Alan Groton, CT 06340 / US | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [2022/42] | Application number, filing date | 22171745.7 | 25.03.2008 | [2022/42] | Priority number, date | US20070910379P | 05.04.2007 Original published format: US 910379 P | US20070976546P | 01.10.2007 Original published format: US 976546 P | US20080031554 | 26.02.2008 Original published format: US 31554 | [2022/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4074702 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/06, A61K31/4439, A61P35/00 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
C07D401/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/4439 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2023/21] |
Former [2022/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ABNORMEM ZELLWACHSTUM BEI SÄUGETIEREN GEEIGNETE KRISTALLINE FORMEN VON 6-[2-(METHYLCARBAMOYL)PHENYLSULFANYL]-3-E-[2-(PYRIDIN-2-YL)ETHENYL]INDAZOL | [2022/42] | English: | CRYSTALLINE FORMS OF 6-[2-(METHYLCARBAMOYL)PHENYLSULFANYL]-3-E-[2-(PYRIDIN-2-YL)ETHENYL]INDAZOLE SUITABLE FOR THE TREATMENT OF ABNORMAL CELL GROWTH IN MAMMALS | [2022/42] | French: | FORMES CRISTALLINES DE 6-[2-(METHYLCARBAMOYL)PHENYLSULFANYL]-3-E-[2-(PYRIDIN-2-YL)ETHENYL]INDAZOLE UTILES POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE CROISSANCE CELLULAIRE ANORMALE CHEZ DES MAMMIFERES | [2022/42] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/21] | 19.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/40] | 16.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2023/40] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08719405.6 / EP2134702 | EP17168752.8 / EP3252047 | Divisional application(s) | EP23167662.8 / EP4249063 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 05.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 05.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 05.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006094763 (YE QIANG [US], et al); | [YD]WO2006123223 (PFIZER [US], et al); | by applicant | US6531491 | US6534524 | US2004224988 | US2006091067 | US2006094763 | US2006094881 | WO2006048745 | WO2006123223 | US7232910 | US2007203196 |