EP4273651 - METHOD FOR PROVIDING A REPLACEMENT PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 10.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seepex GmbH Scharnhölzstrasse 344 46240 Bottrop / DE | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eggers, Martin 45139 Essen / DE | 02 /
Uellenbeck, Malwina Dortmund / DE | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 22171862.0 | 05.05.2022 | [2023/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4273651 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
G05B23/0294 (EP);
G05B13/048 (US);
G05B13/042 (US);
G06K7/10297 (US);
G06Q30/0283 (US);
G05B2219/32015 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] |
Former [2023/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BEREITSTELLEN EINES ERSATZTEILS | [2023/45] | English: | METHOD FOR PROVIDING A REPLACEMENT PART | [2023/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FOURNITURE D'UNE PIÈCE DE RECHANGE | [2023/45] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/24] | 07.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003046132 (KEELEY THOMAS M [US]) [A] 1-25 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0007] , [0046] , [0049]; figures 1,8 *; | [XI]US2004267395 (DISCENZO FREDERICK M [US], et al) [X] 1-9,14,24,25 * paragraphs [0015] - [0028] - [0063] , [0 80] - [0100] - [ 118] , [ 131] - [0159]; figures 1a,1c * [I] 10-13,15-23,26; | [XI]US2016033941 (T RVIA KUMAR [IN], et al) [X] 1,24 * paragraphs [0004] , [0 19] , [0 21] , [ 26 ] - [0 28] * [I] 2-23,25,26; | [XI]US2021109513 (CHAPIN RYAN MATTHEW [US], et al) [X] 1,24 * paragraphs [0007] , [00 8] , [0 37] , [ 61 ] - [0 64] * [I] 2-23,25,26; | [T] - CHIN HON HUIN ET AL, "Asset maintenance optimisation approaches in the chemical and process industries - A review", CHEMICAL ENGINEERING RESEARCH AND DESIGN, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 164, doi:10.1016/J.CHERD.2020.09.034, ISSN 0263-8762, (20201008), pages 162 - 194, (20201008), XP086346728 [T] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cherd.2020.09.034 | by applicant | EP2902930 | US10466689 | EP3751370 |