EP4272567 - SYSTEM FOR PRODUCING SAUSAGE-SHAPED PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Poly-clip System GmbH & Co. KG Niedeckerstraße 1 65795 Hattersheim / DE | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyrahn, Joachim 64390 Erzhausen / DE | 02 /
Münker, Udo 63505 Langenselbold / DE | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 22172196.2 | 06.05.2022 | [2023/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4272567 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A22C11/02, A22C11/12 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
A22C11/0227 (EP);
A22C11/0236 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] |
Former [2023/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM PRODUZIEREN WURSTFÖRMIGER PRODUKTE | [2023/45] | English: | SYSTEM FOR PRODUCING SAUSAGE-SHAPED PRODUCTS | [2023/45] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PRODUCTION DE PRODUITS EN FORME DE SAUCISSES | [2023/45] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/24] | 08.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011081462 (MEYRAHN JOACHIM [DE], et al); | [A]EP3183970 (POLY-CLIP SYSTEM GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [I]US2019059400 (MACH MATTHIAS [DE], et al); | [I]US2019059402 (MACH MATTHIAS [DE], et al) |