EP4276557 - A METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR TRACKING THE DOWNTIME OF A PRODUCTION MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOBST MEX SA Route de Faraz 3 1031 Mex / CH | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELISLE, Maxime 1358 Valeyres / CH | 02 /
KJI, Houda 1822 Chernex / CH | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Sigrid Bobst Mex SA P.O. Box 1001 Lausanne / CH | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 22172319.0 | 09.05.2022 | [2023/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4276557 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/418 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
G05B19/4183 (EP);
G05B19/41865 (CN);
G05B19/4184 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0639 (EP);
G06Q50/04 (EP);
G05B2219/31411 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] |
Former [2023/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EIN VERFAHREN UND EIN SYSTEM ZUR VERFOLGUNG DER STILLSTANDSZEIT EINER PRODUKTIONSMASCHINE | [2023/46] | English: | A METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR TRACKING THE DOWNTIME OF A PRODUCTION MACHINE | [2023/46] | French: | UNE MÉTHODE ET UN SYSTÈME POUR SUIVRE LE TEMPS D'ARRÊT D'UNE MACHINE DE PRODUCTION | [2023/46] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/17] | 19.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005017635 (QUAKER OATS CO [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0016] ** paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0025] *; | [XI]US2006149407 (MARKHAM CHARLES E [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8,9,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraphs [0096] , [0101] * * paragraph [0126] - paragraph [0131] * * paragraph [0142] - paragraph [0146] * * paragraph [0183] - paragraph [0202] * * paragraph [0221] - paragraph [0246] * * paragraphs [0264] , [0265] , [0270] * [I] 5-7,10,12,13; | [A]WO2019199674 (VIDEOJET TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0101] * |