EP4088682 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SURGICAL TOOL INSERTION USING MULTIAXIS FORCE AND MOMENT FEEDBACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Globus Medical, Inc. Valley Forge Business Center 2560 General Armistead Avenue Audubon, PA 19403 / US | [2022/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRAWFORD, Neil CHANDLER, 85224 / US | 02 /
JOHNSON, Norbert NORTH ANDOVER, 01845 / US | [2022/46] | Representative(s) | Morabito, Sara, et al Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l. Piazzetta Cappellato Pedrocchi, 18 35122 Padova / IT | [2022/46] | Application number, filing date | 22172566.6 | 10.05.2022 | [2022/46] | Priority number, date | US202117317344 | 11.05.2021 Original published format: US202117317344 | [2022/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4088682 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/30, A61B90/11, // A61B90/00 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
A61B34/30 (EP,CN);
A61B34/20 (CN);
A61B34/70 (CN);
A61B90/06 (CN);
A61B90/11 (EP);
A61B90/361 (CN);
A61B90/37 (CN);
A61B2034/2055 (CN);
A61B2034/2065 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR EINFÜHRUNG EINES CHIRURGISCHEN INSTRUMENTS UNTER VERWENDUNG MEHRACHSIGER KRAFT- UND DREHMOMENTRÜCKKOPPLUNG | [2022/46] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SURGICAL TOOL INSERTION USING MULTIAXIS FORCE AND MOMENT FEEDBACK | [2022/46] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'INSERTION D'UN OUTIL CHIRURGICAL AU MOYEN D'UNE FORCE MULTIAXIALE ET D'UNE RÉTROACTION DE MOMENT | [2022/46] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 15.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1224918 (BROCK ROGERS SURGICAL INC [US]) [A] 1-11* paragraph [0022]; figure 2 *; | [XI]US2007078475 (BODDULURI MOHAN [US], et al) [X] 1,11 * paragraph [0053]; figure 1 * [I] 2,3; | [I]WO2014062890 (WORCESTER POLYTECH INST [US], et al) [I] 1-3,11 * paragraphs [0056] - [0058] - [0061]; figures 14-16 *; | [A]EP3391848 (GLOBUS MEDICAL INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0090] , [0091]; figures 19A,19B * |