EP4215983 - DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LT, NO | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu SEOUL 07336 / KR | [2023/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Chulki 06772 Seocho-gu, Seoul / KR | 02 /
Lee, Jaehun 06772 Seocho-gu, Seoul / KR | 03 /
Na, Seokhun 06772 Seocho-gu, Seoul / KR | 04 /
Pyo, Jonggil 06772 Seocho-gu, Seoul / KR | 05 /
Kang, Seunggyu 06772 Seocho-gu, Seoul / KR | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/30] | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22172680.5 | 11.05.2022 | [2023/30] | Priority number, date | KR20220009664 | 24.01.2022 Original published format: KR 20220009664 | [2023/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4215983 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4215983 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1333, G06F1/16, G09F9/30 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
G02F1/133305 (EP);
G09F9/301 (EP,CN,KR);
G06F1/1607 (US);
F16M11/04 (KR);
F16M11/22 (KR);
G02F1/133314 (EP);
G02F1/133317 (EP);
G02F1/133328 (EP);
G06F1/1601 (EP);
G06F1/1652 (EP);
G09F9/335 (CN);
H05K5/0217 (CN);
H05K5/03 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2023/30] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE | [2023/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2023/30] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2022 | Examination requested [2023/30] | 12.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LT | 07.02.2024 | NO | 07.05.2024 | IS | 07.06.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/32] | IS | 07.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013155655 (LEE MOUNGYOUB [KR], et al); | [XA]US2021141587 (CHO SEOKHYO [KR]) | Examination | US2016212864 | by applicant | KR20220009664 |