Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.05.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
29.03.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
28.03.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | |
28.03.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
28.03.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
28.01.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
15.11.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
08.07.2023 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
07.07.2023 | First examination report | |
21.04.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
21.04.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
21.04.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
18.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
29.03.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.09.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.10.2022 [2022/42] |
11.06.2022 | Change - representative | |
11.05.2022 | Change - representative |