Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021228899 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE202020107374 | 17.12.2020 | DE202020107373 | 17.12.2020 | DE202020107372 | 17.12.2020 | EP20215225 | 17.12.2020 | EP20173968 | 11.05.2020 | WO2020EP72820 | 13.08.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021028555 | Global Dossier | 18.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20173968 | 11.05.2020 | DE102019212126 | 13.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023189861 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE202020107374 | 17.12.2020 | DE202020107373 | 17.12.2020 | DE202020107372 | 17.12.2020 | EP20215225 | 17.12.2020 | EP20173968 | 11.05.2020 | WO2020EP72820 | 13.08.2020 | WO2021EP62550 | 11.05.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022325079 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20173968 | 11.05.2020 | WO2020EP72820 | 13.08.2020 | DE102019212126 | 13.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4403325 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE202020107374 | 17.12.2020 | DE202020107373 | 17.12.2020 | DE202020107372 | 17.12.2020 | EP22172706 | 11.05.2021 | EP21729409 | 11.05.2021 | EP20215225 | 17.12.2020 | EP20173968 | 11.05.2020 | WO2020EP72820 | 13.08.2020 | WO2021EP62550 | 11.05.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4042879 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20764951 | 13.08.2020 | EP20173968 | 11.05.2020 | WO2020EP72820 | 13.08.2020 | DE102019212126 | 13.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4025631 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2023 | C0 | EP4025631 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2023 | B1 | EP4025631 | 13.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE202020107374 | 17.12.2020 | DE202020107373 | 17.12.2020 | DE202020107372 | 17.12.2020 | EP20215225 | 17.12.2020 | EP20173968 | 11.05.2020 | WO2020EP72820 | 13.08.2020 | WO2021EP62550 | 11.05.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3954727 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020EP72820 | 13.08.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3910006 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE202020107374 | 17.12.2020 | DE202020107373 | 17.12.2020 | DE202020107372 | 17.12.2020 | EP20215225 | 17.12.2020 | EP20173968 | 11.05.2020 | WO2020EP72820 | 13.08.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3910005 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE202020107374 | 17.12.2020 | DE202020107373 | 17.12.2020 | DE202020107372 | 17.12.2020 | EP20764951 | 13.08.2020 | EP20215225 | 17.12.2020 | EP20173968 | 11.05.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3855938 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2022 | B1 | EP3855938 | 04.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20173968 | 11.05.2020 | WO2020EP72820 | 13.08.2020 | DE102019212126 | 13.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3777564 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2022 | B1 | EP3777564 | 03.03.2021 | A3 | EP3777564 | 17.02.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102019212126 | 13.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2021270978 | Global Dossier | 19.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE202020107374 | 17.12.2020 | DE202020107373 | 17.12.2020 | DE202020107372 | 17.12.2020 | EP20215225 | 17.12.2020 | EP20173968 | 11.05.2020 | WO2020EP72820 | 13.08.2020 | WO2021EP62550 | 11.05.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020329603B | Global Dossier | 14.03.2024 | B2 | AU2020329603 | 31.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20173968 | 11.05.2020 | WO2020EP72820 | 13.08.2020 | DE102019212126 | 13.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4074758 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2024 | C0 | EP4074758 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2024 | B1 | EP4074758 | 19.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE202020107374 | 17.12.2020 | DE202020107373 | 17.12.2020 | DE202020107372 | 17.12.2020 | EP21729409 | 11.05.2021 | EP20215225 | 17.12.2020 | EP20173968 | 11.05.2020 | WO2020EP72820 | 13.08.2020 | WO2021EP62550 | 11.05.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102019212126 | 25.05.2023 | B4 | DE102019212126 | 18.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102019212126 | 13.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202020102635U | 19.05.2020 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE102019212126 | 13.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202020104712U | 02.10.2020 | U1 | Priority number | Date | EP20173968 | 11.05.2020 | DE102019212126 | 13.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202020107372U | 18.01.2021 | U1 | Priority number | Date | EP20173968 | 11.05.2020 | WO2020EP72820 | 13.08.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202020107373U | 18.01.2021 | U1 | Priority number | Date | EP20173968 | 11.05.2020 | WO2020EP72820 | 13.08.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202020107374U | 18.01.2021 | U1 | Priority number | Date | EP20173968 | 11.05.2020 | WO2020EP72820 | 13.08.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202021102590U | 14.06.2021 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE202020107372 | 17.12.2020 | EP20215225 | 17.12.2020 | EP20173968 | 11.05.2020 | WO2020EP72820 | 13.08.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202021102591U | 14.06.2021 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE202020107373 | 17.12.2020 | EP20215225 | 17.12.2020 | EP20173968 | 11.05.2020 | WO2020EP72820 | 13.08.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202021102592U | 14.06.2021 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE202020107374 | 17.12.2020 | EP20215225 | 17.12.2020 | EP20173968 | 11.05.2020 | WO2020EP72820 | 13.08.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3855938T | 11.07.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP20173968 | 11.05.2020 | WO2020EP72820 | 13.08.2020 | DE102019212126 | 13.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2922232T | 12.09.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP20173968 | 11.05.2020 | WO2020EP72820 | 13.08.2020 | DE102019212126 | 13.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2964609T | 08.04.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE202020107374 | 17.12.2020 | DE202020107373 | 17.12.2020 | DE202020107372 | 17.12.2020 | EP20215225 | 17.12.2020 | EP20173968 | 11.05.2020 | WO2020EP72820 | 13.08.2020 | WO2021EP62550 | 11.05.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20220791T | 16.09.2022 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP20764951 | 13.08.2020 | EP20173968 | 11.05.2020 | WO2020EP72820 | 13.08.2020 | DE102019212126 | 13.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE058997T | 28.09.2022 | T2 | Priority number | Date | EP20173968 | 11.05.2020 | DE102019212126 | 13.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT3855938T | 25.07.2022 | T | Priority number | Date | EP20173968 | 11.05.2020 | WO2020EP72820 | 13.08.2020 | DE102019212126 | 13.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3855938T | 25.07.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP20173968 | 11.05.2020 | WO2020EP72820 | 13.08.2020 | DE102019212126 | 13.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3855938T | 08.07.2022 | T | Priority number | Date | DE102019212126 | 13.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI3855938T | 30.09.2022 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP20764951 | 13.08.2020 | EP20173968 | 11.05.2020 | WO2020EP72820 | 13.08.2020 | DE102019212126 | 13.08.2019 | Type | Divisional application | EP4403325 | Type | Earlier application | EP4025631 |