EP4074758 - GRANULATE OF ONLY NATURAL CONSTITUTIONS; GRANULATE FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF COMPOSABLE PRODUCTS AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE GRANULATE AND THE PRODUCTS OBTAINED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Unitary effect registered Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for unitary effect filed Status updated on 01.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | New entry: Payment of renewal fee | Proprietor(s) | For all participating member states Hope Tree International GmbH Schwanthalerstr. 14 80336 München / DE | [2024/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DINZINGER, Lambert Dustin 82538 Geretsried-Gelting / DE | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB Steinsdorfstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [2024/28] | Application number, filing date | 22172706.8 | 11.05.2021 | [2022/42] | Procedural language | DE | (Principal) place of business Tooltip on the date of filing | Principal place of businessTooltip | Unitary Patent Protection | 31.05.2024 | Date of request for unitary effect [2024/28] | 10.06.2024 | Decision on the request for unitary effect: Positive [2024/28] | 10.06.2024 | Date of registration [2024/28] | 01.05.2024 | Date of legal effect [2024/28] | Member States covered by Unitary Tooltip Patent Protection | 10.06.2024 | AT, BE, BG, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, IT, LT, LU, LV, MT, NL, PT, SE, SI [2024/28] | Publication | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4074758 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/18] | Renewal fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee unitary effect year 04 |