Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
06.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
03.05.2024 | First examination report | |
01.09.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
01.09.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] |
01.09.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] |
30.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
27.01.2023 | Publication of search report | published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
27.01.2023 | Change - classification | published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
27.01.2023 | Change - classification | published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
28.10.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
11.05.2022 | Change - representative |