EP4276865 - MICRO SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zippy Technology Corp. 10F, No. 50, Min-Chuan Rd. Hsin-Tien Dist, New Taipei City / TW | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Chiu-Fu New Taipei City / TW | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft mbB Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 22172949.4 | 12.05.2022 | [2023/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4276865 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4276865 | Date: | 11.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/02, H01H13/28, H01H3/02, H01H13/18 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
H01H13/28 (EP);
H01H13/807 (EP);
H01H3/0213 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] |
Former [2023/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MIKROSCHALTER | [2023/46] | English: | MICRO SWITCH | [2023/46] | French: | MICROCOMMUTATEUR | [2023/46] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/08] | 15.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 17.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016099119 (MIYOSHI TETSUHIKO [JP], et al); | [A]US2017092445 (ZHANG HUA [CN], et al); | [A]JP6188155B ; | [A]EP3745436 (KEDU ELECTRIC CO LTD [CN]) | by applicant | JPH0113583B | CN204167164U | CN105489429 | JP6188155B | EP3002768 | US10256056 |