EP4105729 - IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABE, Hideto Ohta-ku, 146-8501 / JP | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2022/51] | Application number, filing date | 22173181.3 | 13.05.2022 | [2022/51] | Priority number, date | JP20210100082 | 16.06.2021 Original published format: JP 2021100082 | [2022/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4105729 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G03G21/20 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
G03G21/206 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G03G15/0258 (CN);
G03G15/01 (KR);
G03G21/20 (CN);
G03G21/1633 (KR);
G03G2221/1645 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] |
Former [2022/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/51] | English: | IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS | [2022/51] | French: | APPAREIL DE FORMATION D'IMAGES | [2022/51] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | 21.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2009025759 (KYOCERA MITA CORP); | [X]JP2009222736 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [A]JP2009237195 (KYOCERA MITA CORP); | [A]US2017160699 (IMANARI HIROSHI [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2007041562 | JP2016218420 |