EP4276692 - NEURAL NETWORK LAYER FOR NON-LINEAR NORMALIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Metzen, Jan Hendrik 71034 Boeblingen / DE | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 22173331.4 | 13.05.2022 | [2023/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4276692 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/04, G06N3/08, G06N5/00, // B25J9/16 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
G06N3/084 (EP);
G06N3/048 (KR);
G06N20/10 (CN,KR);
G06N3/0499 (EP,KR,US);
G06N3/04 (CN);
G06N3/047 (KR);
G06N3/08 (CN);
G06N3/09 (EP,KR);
G06N5/01 (EP);
G06N7/01 (CN);
B25J9/1697 (EP);
G05B2219/39102 (EP);
G06N3/086 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] |
Former [2023/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEURONALE NETZWERKSCHICHT ZUR NICHTLINEAREN NORMIERUNG | [2023/46] | English: | NEURAL NETWORK LAYER FOR NON-LINEAR NORMALIZATION | [2023/46] | French: | COUCHE DE RÉSEAU NEURONAL DE NORMALISATION NON LINÉAIRE | [2023/46] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/25] | 15.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2021158088 (SHAO WENQI [CN], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0018] *; | [A]US2021201115 (LASZLO SARAH ANN [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0197] - [0199]; figures 7,13,15 *; | [A]CN113627356 (SHANGHAI RADIO EQUIPMENT INST) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [I] - KIM DAEHYON, "Nonlinear Normalization Model to Improve the Performance of Neural Networks", ASIA-PACIFIC JOURNAL OF CONVERGENT RESEARCH INTERCHANGE, vol. 61116, no. 30, doi:10.47116/apjcri.2020.11.16, (20201130), pages 183 - 192, URL: http://fucos.or.kr/journal/APJCRI/Articles/v6n11/16.pdf, (20221101), XP055976734 [I] 1-13 * page 183 - page 191 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.47116/apjcri.2020.11.16 | by applicant | - BA et al., Layer Normalization, (20160000), URL: https://arxiv.org/abs/1607.06450 | - ULYANOV et al., Instance Normalization: The Missing Ingredient for Fast Stylization, (20160000), URL: https://arxiv.org/abs/1607.08022 |