EP4092509 - SYSTEM FOR REMOTELY INTERACTING WITH POINTING MEANS OF A DISPLAY SYSTEM OF AN AIRCRAFT'S COCKPIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/47] | SYSTEM FOR REMOTE INTERACTION WITH A MEANS FOR AIMING FOR AN AIRCRAFT COCKPIT VIEWING SYSTEM | ||
[2023/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THALES Tour Carpe Diem Place des Corolles - Esplanade Nord 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BESNARD, Mathieu 33700 Merignac / FR | 02 /
CONI, Philippe 33700 Merignac / FR | 03 /
EGEA, Sarah 33700 Merignac / FR | 04 /
LE ROUX, Yannick 33700 Mérignac / FR | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Atout PI Laplace Immeuble Up On 25 Boulevard Romain Rolland CS 40072 75685 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/47] | Atout PI Laplace Immeuble "Visium" 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 22173415.5 | 16.05.2022 | [2022/47] | Priority number, date | FR20210005110 | 17.05.2021 Original published format: FR 2105110 | [2022/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4092509 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4092509 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033, G06F3/0354, G06F3/039, B60K37/06, B64D43/00, B60K35/00, B60K37/04 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
G06F3/03547 (EP);
B64D43/00 (EP,US);
B60K35/00 (EP,US);
B60K35/10 (EP,US);
B60K35/50 (EP,US);
G06F3/033 (EP);
G06F3/0393 (EP);
B60K2360/117 (EP);
B60K2360/139 (EP,US);
B60K2360/1434 (EP,US);
B60K2360/1438 (EP);
B60K2360/33 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/47] | G06F3/033, B60K37/06, B64D43/00, G06F3/0354, G06F3/039 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] |
Former [2022/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR FERNINTERAKTION MIT ZEIGEMITTELN VON EINEM ANZEIGESYSTEM EINES FLUGZEUGCOCKPITS | [2023/01] | English: | SYSTEM FOR REMOTELY INTERACTING WITH POINTING MEANS OF A DISPLAY SYSTEM OF AN AIRCRAFT'S COCKPIT | [2023/01] | French: | SYSTÈME D'INTERACTION À DISTANCE AVEC UN MOYEN DE POINTAGE D'UN SYSTÈME DE VISUALISATION DE COCKPIT D'AÉRONEF | [2022/47] |
Former [2022/47] | SYSTEM ZUR FERNINTERAKTION MIT EINEM ZEIGEMITTEL EINES ANZEIGESYSTEMS EINES FLUGZEUGCOCKPITS | ||
Former [2022/47] | SYSTEM FOR REMOTE INTERACTION WITH A MEANS FOR AIMING FOR AN AIRCRAFT COCKPIT VIEWING SYSTEM | Examination procedure | 19.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 07.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.03.2023 | CZ | 29.03.2023 | DK | 29.03.2023 | EE | 29.03.2023 | ES | 29.03.2023 | FI | 29.03.2023 | HR | 29.03.2023 | LT | 29.03.2023 | LV | 29.03.2023 | MC | 29.03.2023 | NL | 29.03.2023 | PL | 29.03.2023 | RO | 29.03.2023 | RS | 29.03.2023 | SE | 29.03.2023 | SI | 29.03.2023 | SK | 29.03.2023 | SM | 29.03.2023 | NO | 29.06.2023 | GR | 30.06.2023 | IS | 29.07.2023 | PT | 31.07.2023 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/10] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
MC | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
MC | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 29.03.2023 | |
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 29.03.2023 | |
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 29.03.2023 | |
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 29.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014062884 (DAVIES JOHN ALUN [GB], et al); | [A]EP2808763 (AIRBUS HELICOPTERS [FR]); | [A]US10732774 (GOSCH CLINT L [US], et al); | [A]WO2021005166 (SAFRAN ELECTRONICS & DEFENSE COCKPIT SOLUTIONS [FR]) |