EP4092295 - GEARBOX DEVICE FOR AGRICULTURAL MACHINE AND RELATED METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuhn SAS 4 impasse des Fabriques 67700 Saverne / FR | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEMANET, Didier 57820 SAINT-LOUIS / FR | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Hager, Esther Evelyne Kuhn SAS 4 Impasse des Fabriques 67700 Saverne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/47] | Esch, Esther Evelyne Kuhn SAS 4 Impasse des Fabriques 67700 Saverne / FR | Application number, filing date | 22173529.3 | 16.05.2022 | [2022/47] | Priority number, date | FR20210005177 | 18.05.2021 Original published format: FR 2105177 | [2022/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4092295 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16H63/04, F16H3/091, F16H3/00, F16H3/12, F16H3/24, F16H61/04 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
F16H3/002 (EP);
A01B71/066 (US);
F16H3/089 (US);
F16H3/24 (EP);
F16H2061/047 (EP);
F16H2200/0034 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] |
Former [2022/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GETRIEBEVORRICHTUNG FÜR LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHE MASCHINE UND DAMIT VERBUNDENES VERFAHREN | [2022/47] | English: | GEARBOX DEVICE FOR AGRICULTURAL MACHINE AND RELATED METHOD | [2022/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BOÎTE DE VITESSE POUR MACHINE AGRICOLE ET PROCÉDÉ S'Y RAPPORTANT | [2022/47] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 23.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB736521 (HANNOVERSCHE MASCHB AG); | [A]FR1472155 ; | [A]JPS57176949U | by applicant | FR2778443 |