EP4075816 - TRANSFERRING PLAYBACK QUEUES BETWEEN DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAHAM, David C. Cupertino, 95014 / US | 02 /
CARRIGAN, Taylor G. Cupertino, 95014 / US | 03 /
PAULSON, Nicholas J. Cupertino, 95014 / US | 04 /
SCHMIDT, Johannes P. Cupertino, 95014 / US | 05 /
ALSINA, Thomas Cupertino, 95014 / US | 06 /
BRADLEY, Bob Cupertino, 95014 / US | 07 /
YE, Haishan Cupertino, 95014 / US | 08 /
GRANDY, James C. Cupertino, 95014 / US | 09 /
DE LASTIC, Pierre Cupertino, 95014 / US | 10 /
LEROUGE, Julien Cupertino, 95014 / US | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Barton, Russell Glen Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2022/42] | Application number, filing date | 22173626.7 | 03.05.2018 | [2022/42] | Priority number, date | US201762507100P | 16.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762507100 P | [2022/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4075816 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/41, H04N21/4363, H04N21/472, H04N21/25, H04N7/16, H04L9/32, H04L9/40, H04N21/254, H04N21/414, H04N21/482 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
H04N21/43637 (EP,CN,US);
H04W4/021 (CN);
H04L63/083 (CN);
H04L63/0876 (CN);
H04L63/10 (CN);
H04L9/3213 (CN);
H04N21/25 (EP);
H04N21/2541 (EP,CN);
H04N21/41265 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/41407 (EP,US);
H04N21/436 (CN);
H04N21/4627 (CN);
H04N21/472 (EP,US);
H04N21/47217 (EP,US);
H04N21/4825 (EP,US);
H04N7/162 (EP);
H04W4/80 (EP,CN);
H04W76/11 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNG VON WIEDERGABEWARTESCHLANGEN ZWISCHEN VORRICHTUNGEN | [2022/42] | English: | TRANSFERRING PLAYBACK QUEUES BETWEEN DEVICES | [2022/42] | French: | TRANSFERT DE FILES D'ATTENTE DE LECTURE ENTRE DES DISPOSITIFS | [2022/42] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 05.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18727926.0 / EP3593537 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2013347117 (PARKS JASON [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0032] * * figures 3, 4 *; | [A]US9323916 (WU HUAHUI [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 1 - column 7, line 65 ** figures 3, 4 * |