EP4092524 - OTA DIFFERENTIAL UPGRADE METHOD AND SYSTEM OF MASTER-SLAVE ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Abup Technology Co., Ltd 401 Room, 2 Boyun Road China (Shanghai) Free Trade Pilot Area Pudong Shanghai 200120 / CN | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Wei Pudong, Shanghai / CN | 02 /
SUN, Rongwei Pudong, Shanghai / CN | 03 /
WAN, Xuejing Pudong, Shanghai / CN | 04 /
ZHAO, Xing Pudong, Shanghai / CN | 05 /
SHEN, Rui Pudong, Shanghai / CN | 06 /
WANG, Pengfei Pudong, Shanghai / CN | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Bandpay & Greuter 11 rue Christophe Colomb 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/47] | Bandpay & Greuter 30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 22173857.8 | 17.05.2022 | [2022/47] | Priority number, date | CN202110548439 | 19.05.2021 Original published format: CN202110548439 | [2022/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4092524 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4092524 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F8/658 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
G06F8/658 (EP,CN,US);
H04L67/34 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] |
Former [2022/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | OTA-DIFFERENZIAL-AUFRÜSTUNGSVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM DER MASTER-SLAVE-ARCHITEKTUR | [2022/47] | English: | OTA DIFFERENTIAL UPGRADE METHOD AND SYSTEM OF MASTER-SLAVE ARCHITECTURE | [2022/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE MISE À NIVEAU DIFFÉRENTIELLE OTA D'UNE ARCHITECTURE MAÎTRE-ESCLAVE | [2022/47] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 29.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 22.11.2023 | ES | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | PL | 22.11.2023 | RO | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SK | 22.11.2023 | SM | 22.11.2023 | NO | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7461374 (BALINT MATTHEW [US], et al) |