EP4105360 - ELECTROLYZER SYSTEM WITH STEAM GENERATION AND METHOD OF OPERATING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bloom Energy Corporation 4353 North First Street San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEINGAERTNER, David Sunnyvale, CA94087 / US | 02 /
TA, Andy San Jose, CA 95121 / US | 03 /
GOVINDARASU, Navaneethakrishnan Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 04 /
PATEL, Siddharth Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | 05 /
NGUYEN, Kim Fremont, CA 94539 / US | 06 /
JOSHI, Nandan San Jose, CA 95134 / US | 07 /
BELL, Shannon Chula Vista, CA 91915 / US | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | Wichmann, Hendrik Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/51] | Wichmann, Hendrik Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22173906.3 | 17.05.2022 | [2022/51] | Priority number, date | US202163190049P | 18.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163190049 P | US202163216995P | 30.06.2021 Original published format: US 202163216995 P | [2022/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4105360 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4105360 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C25B1/042, C25B9/67, C25B15/021, H01M8/2425 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
C25B1/042 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C25B9/60 (CN);
C25B15/02 (KR);
C25B15/021 (EP,US);
C25B15/08 (CN,KR,US);
C25B15/083 (KR);
C25B15/085 (KR);
C25B9/65 (US);
C25B9/67 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C25B9/75 (US);
C25B9/77 (KR,US);
F22B1/003 (KR);
F22B1/02 (KR);
F22B27/04 (KR);
F22D1/003 (US);
F22D1/006 (KR);
F22D1/08 (US);
F22D1/12 (US);
F22G1/02 (KR);
C25B13/07 (KR);
C25B9/23 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] |
Former [2022/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROLYSEURSYSTEM MIT DAMPFERZEUGUNG UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2022/51] | English: | ELECTROLYZER SYSTEM WITH STEAM GENERATION AND METHOD OF OPERATING SAME | [2022/51] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉLECTROLYSEUR AVEC GÉNÉRATION DE VAPEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2022/51] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | 19.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 28.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 28.09.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 28.09.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.10.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2018513915 ; | [XAI]US2018287179 (RUEGER DIETMAR [DE], et al); | [XAYI]US2019245224 (LACROIX VINCENT [FR], et al); | [XY]CN111139493B ; |