EP4279409 - COLLAPSIBLE CONTAINER AND CONTAINER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schoeller Allibert GmbH Sacktannen 1 19057 Schwerin / DE | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUIZINGH, Jan Abraham 9541 AH Vlagtwedde / NL | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 22174159.8 | 18.05.2022 | [2023/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4279409 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65D6/16, B65D6/18, B65D21/02, B65D25/28 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
B65D21/0204 (EP);
B65D11/18 (EP);
B65D11/1813 (EP);
B65D11/1853 (EP);
B65D25/2852 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLAPPBARER BEHÄLTER UND BEHÄLTER-SYSTEM | [2023/47] | English: | COLLAPSIBLE CONTAINER AND CONTAINER SYSTEM | [2023/47] | French: | RÉCIPIENT PLIABLE ET SYSTÈME DE RÉCIPIENT | [2023/47] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0075655 (STUCKI KUNSTSTOFFWERK [DE]) [Y] 6 * figure 2 *; | [Y]US5474230 (YOTUKURA MASAKATU [JP]) [Y] 7-9,11,12* column 1, line 60 - line 67; figure 20 *; | [XAY]DE29611833U (BONSACK BIRGIT [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,14 * figure 3e * * paragraph [0016] * [A] 5,10,13,15 [Y] 6-9,11,12 | by applicant | WO2009053687 | EP3901047 |