EP4280126 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING WEAR AND USE OF A PRODUCTION MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Geipel, Markus Michael 80799 München / DE | 02 /
Krubasik, Edward Cornelius 82319 Starnberg / DE | 03 /
Montrone, Francesco 85521 Riemerling / DE | 04 /
Palacios Valdes, Carlos Andres 81739 München / DE | 05 /
Reitinger, Axel 81377 München / DE | 06 /
Siegel, Tobias 92318 Neumarkt in der Oberpfalz / DE | 07 /
Sutor, Ariane 81543 München / DE | 08 /
Weinert, Nils 80798 München / DE | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 22174628.2 | 20.05.2022 | [2023/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4280126 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00, G06Q50/04 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
G06Q10/20 (EP);
G06Q50/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON VERSCHLEISS UND ABNUTZUNG EINES PRODUKTIONSMITTELS | [2023/47] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING WEAR AND USE OF A PRODUCTION MEDIUM | [2023/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE L'USURE ET DE DÉTÉRIORATION D'UN MOYEN DE PRODUCTION | [2023/47] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/42] | 07.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - Rosenbaum B. ET AL, "Ohne Daten keine Digitalisierung", DIGITAL MANUFACTURING, (20210228), pages 1 - 56, URL: https://www.digital-manufacturing-magazin.de/wp-content/uploads/digital-manufacturing-magazin-ausgabe-2-2021-1.pdf, (20221102), XP055977289 [X] 1,8,9 * pages 8-9 * [I] 2-7 | [I] - Ruppert J., "Edge: Lokale Intelligenz digitalisiert die Fertigung", (20180903), pages 1 - 14, URL: https://www.ingenieur.de/fachmedien/konstruktion/automatisierung/edge-lokale-intelligenz-digitalisiert-die-fertigung/, (20221102), XP055977270 [I] 1-9 * pages 1-10 * | [I] - Balint Christoph, "Entwicklung einer Lösung zur optischen Verschleißerkennung in einer Werkzeugmaschine", (20211231), pages 1 - 29, URL: https://www.matse.itc.rwth-aachen.de/dienste/public/show_document.php?id=59769485, (20221102), XP055977294 [I] 1-9 * pages 7-25 * |