EP4279232 - ELECTRIC SHAVERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALERO, Jonathan, Alambra Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
DOODEMAN, Gerardus, Johannes, Nicolaas Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
RAEDTS, Peter, Johannes, Antonius 5656AG Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
FRACKOWIAK, Bruno, Jean, François 5656AG Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
VISSER, Cornelis, Gerardus Eindhoven / NL | 06 /
VARGHESE, Babu Eindhoven / NL | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 22174680.3 | 20.05.2022 | [2023/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4279232 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B26B21/48, B26B19/46 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
B26B21/48 (EP);
B26B19/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE RASIERAPPARATE | [2023/47] | English: | ELECTRIC SHAVERS | [2023/47] | French: | RASOIRS ÉLECTRIQUES | [2023/47] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/43] | 13.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5383917 (DESAI JAWAHAR M [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008004678 (KREINDEL MICHAEL [IL]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US2010198134 (ECKHOUSE SHIMON [IL], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0043] - [0049]; figures 8A-10 *; | [A]US2011167640 (FLYASH LION [IL], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0024] - [0039]; figures 1-2F *; | [A]EP3978212 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0028] - [0030]; figure 1 * | by applicant | US5383917 | US2013231611 |