EP4095443 - ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICE WITH A FUEL CELL UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.2023 [2023/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GreenAge AG Heinrich-Hertz-Strasse 3 63303 Dreieich-Dreieichenhain / DE | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Büchting, Michael Andreas 63225 Langen / DE | 02 /
Dähne, Mirko 65428 Rüsselsheim / DE | 03 /
Siegel, Peter 64546 Mörfelden-Walldorf / DE | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2022/48] | Liedtke & Partner Patentanwälte Gerhart-Hauptmann-Straße 10/11 99096 Erfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 22174760.3 | 23.05.2022 | [2022/48] | Priority number, date | DE202110113423 | 25.05.2021 Original published format: DE102021113423 | [2022/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4095443 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F24D18/00, F24H15/215, F24H15/219, F24H15/223, F24H15/242, // F24D101/30 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
F24D18/00 (EP);
F24H15/215 (EP);
F24H15/219 (EP);
F24H15/223 (EP);
F24H15/242 (EP);
F24D2101/30 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENERGIEWANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER BRENNSTOFFZELLENEINHEIT | [2022/48] | English: | ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICE WITH A FUEL CELL UNIT | [2022/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION D'ÉNERGIE À L'AIDE D'UNITÉ DE PILE À COMBUSTIBLE | [2022/48] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/45] | 23.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2001068125 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [X] 1,8,9,13 * paragraphs [0001] - [0051]; figure 1 *[I] 2,4,6,7,10-12; | [XI]WO0240927 (VAILLANT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,5,8,9,13 * page 4, paragraph 1 - page 7, paragraph 5; figure 1 * [I] 1,2,4,6,11,12; | [XI]US2006053794 (LICARI JAMES P [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,7-10,13 * paragraphs [0011] - [0021]; figure 1 * [I] 2,4,6,11,12 |