EP4283018 - METHOD OF PRODUCING A CONCENTRATED HYDROGEN PEROXIDE SOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2023/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwarz, Hermann 97084 Würzburg / DE | [2023/48] | Application number, filing date | 22174986.4 | 24.05.2022 | [2023/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4283018 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C25B1/30, C25B9/70, C25B15/08 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
C25B15/087 (EP);
C25B1/30 (EP);
C25B9/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] |
Former [2023/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER KONZENTRIERTEN WASSERSTOFFPEROXIDLÖSUNG | [2023/48] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING A CONCENTRATED HYDROGEN PEROXIDE SOLUTION | [2023/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE SOLUTION DE PEROXYDE D'HYDROGÈNE CONCENTRÉE | [2023/48] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | 08.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]JPH09279377 (TAKUMA KK) [X] 13 * the whole document * [A] 2 [I] 1,3-12,14,15; | [XAI]JP3677078B (PERMELEC ELECTRODE LTD; KATAYAMA CHEMICAL WORKS CO) [X] 13 * the whole document * [A] 2 [I] 1,3-12,14,15; | [A]US2006239872 (BUNN THOMAS L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1896632 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document * |