EP4095506 - TEST KIT FOR TESTING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.07.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAF Trucks N.V. Hugo van der Goeslaan 1 5643 TW Eindhoven / NL | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKKERMANS, Luc Henricus Maria 5643 TW Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
STREEFKERK, Remco 5643 TW Eindhoven / NL | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 22175150.6 | 24.05.2022 | [2022/48] | Priority number, date | NL20212028289 | 26.05.2021 Original published format: NL 2028289 | [2022/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4095506 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01M15/04, F02D41/00, F02D31/00 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
G01M15/044 (EP);
G01M15/05 (US);
F02D31/008 (EP);
F02D41/0087 (EP);
F02D2041/1432 (EP);
F02D2200/0625 (EP);
F02D41/2438 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] |
Former [2022/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TESTKIT ZUM PRÜFEN EINES VERBRENNUNGSMOTORS | [2022/48] | English: | TEST KIT FOR TESTING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2022/48] | French: | KIT DE TEST POUR TESTER UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2022/48] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 10.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6002980 (TAYLOR DENNIS O [US], et al); | [A]US6185996 (HE CHUAN [US], et al); | [A]US2010031738 (FELDKAMP TIMOTHY MARK [US], et al); | [A]US2018052077 (ADACHI NORIYASU [JP], et al); | [A]US2019339164 (KUPIEC GREGORY R [US], et al) | by applicant | US3994160 |