blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4124673

EP4124673 - METHOD OF PROCESSING SUBSTRATE, METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE, SUBSTRATE PROCESSING APPARATUS, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.12.2022
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip26.02.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kokusai Electric Corp.
3-4, Kandakaji-cho
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 1010045 / JP
[2023/05]
Inventor(s)01 / DEGAI, Motomu
Toyama, 9392393 / JP
02 / NAKATANI, Kimihiko
Toyama, 9392393 / JP
03 / HASHIMOTO, Yoshitomo
Toyama, 9392393 / JP
04 / WASEDA, Takayuki
Toyama, 9392393 / JP
 [2023/05]
Representative(s)Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2023/05]
Application number, filing date22175384.125.05.2022
[2023/05]
Priority number, dateJP2021012275127.07.2021         Original published format: JP 2021122751
[2023/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4124673
Date:01.02.2023
Language:EN
[2023/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.2022
ClassificationIPC:C23C16/02, C23C16/04, C23C16/40, C23C16/455, H01L21/02, B05D1/00
[2023/05]
CPC:
C23C16/04 (EP,KR); H01L21/32 (EP,KR); H01L21/02359 (US);
C23C16/0236 (EP,KR,US); C23C16/401 (EP); C23C16/45534 (EP,KR);
C23C16/52 (KR,US); H01L21/02126 (EP); H01L21/02211 (EP);
H01L21/0228 (EP,KR); H01L21/02312 (KR); B05D1/32 (EP);
B05D2203/30 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/36]
Former [2023/05]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG EINES SUBSTRATS, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HALBLEITERBAUELEMENTS, SUBSTRATVERARBEITUNGSGERÄT UND PROGRAMM[2023/05]
English:METHOD OF PROCESSING SUBSTRATE, METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE, SUBSTRATE PROCESSING APPARATUS, AND PROGRAM[2023/05]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE SUBSTRAT, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR, APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE SUBSTRAT ET PROGRAMME[2023/05]
Examination procedure25.05.2022Examination requested  [2023/05]
01.08.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.08.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2012202357  (SATO TATSUYA E [US], et al);
 [A]US2017256402  (KAUFMAN-OSBORN TOBIN [US], et al);
 [E]EP4080548  (KOKUSAI ELECTRIC CORP [JP])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.