EP4095180 - BIODEGRADABLE POLYESTER RESIN, PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF, AND BIODEGRADABLE POLYESTER FILM COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SK leaveo Co., Ltd. 102, Jeongja-ro Jangan-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16338 / KR | [2024/22] |
Former [2022/48] | For all designated states Ecovance Co. Ltd 102, Jeongja-ro Jangan-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16338 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Kyung Youn 16338 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
KIM, Hoon 16338 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
KIM, Seong Dong 16338 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
RYU, Ji Yeon 16338 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
KIM, Hyung Mo 16338 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 22175535.8 | 25.05.2022 | [2022/48] | Priority number, date | KR20210067190 | 25.05.2021 Original published format: KR 20210067190 | [2022/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4095180 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4095180 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/183, C08J5/18 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
C08G63/183 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08G63/16 (KR);
C08G63/78 (CN);
C08J5/18 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08L1/02 (KR);
C08L1/04 (US);
C08L1/12 (US);
C08L67/02 (KR);
C08G2230/00 (CN,KR,US);
C08J2300/16 (EP);
C08J2367/02 (EP,CN);
C08J2401/02 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] |
Former [2022/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARES POLYESTERHARZ, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTER BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARER POLYESTERFILM | [2022/48] | English: | BIODEGRADABLE POLYESTER RESIN, PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF, AND BIODEGRADABLE POLYESTER FILM COMPRISING THE SAME | [2022/48] | French: | RÉSINE DE POLYESTER BIODÉGRADABLE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION, ET FILM DE POLYESTER BIODÉGRADABLE LA COMPRENANT | [2022/48] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 30.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 14.02.2024 | HR | 14.02.2024 | PL | 14.02.2024 | NO | 14.05.2024 | RS | 14.05.2024 | GR | 15.05.2024 | IS | 14.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/35] | ES | 14.02.2024 | |
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 14.05.2024 | |
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 14.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001007899 (CHUNG HYUN SOO [KR], et al) [A] 1-9 * Examples ** Claims *; | [I]CN103483522 (SHANGHAI GENIUS ADVANCED MAT) [I] 1-9 * Examples * * Claims * | by applicant | KR20120103158 |