EP4286063 - SORTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Binder + Co AG Grazer Strasse 19-25 8200 Gleisdorf / AT | [2023/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taucher, Reinhard 8062 Kumberg / AT | 02 /
Kreimer, Daniel 8160 Weiz / AT | 03 /
Kober, Philipp 8262 Ilz / AT | [2023/49] | Representative(s) | KLIMENT & HENHAPEL Patentanwälte OG Gonzagagasse 15/2 1010 Wien / AT | [2023/49] | Application number, filing date | 22176180.2 | 30.05.2022 | [2023/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4286063 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B07C1/04 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
B07C5/3425 (EP);
B07C5/342 (US);
B07C5/36 (US);
B07C5/365 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SORTIERVORRICHTUNG | [2023/49] | English: | SORTING DEVICE | [2023/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRI | [2023/49] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/49] | 18.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3586984 (VAN LOOY ERIC [ES]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]JP6833035B (NHYDYDRO ALUMINIUM ROLLED PROD GMBH) [A] 1-15 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US2022072589 (HUBER REINHOLD [AT], et al) [A] 1-15* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [AD]EP3967413 (BINDER CO AG [AT]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP3967413 |