EP4235459 - CHURN PREVENTION USING GRAPHS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intuit Inc. 2700 Coast Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMAKRISHNAN, Rohith 560103 Karnataka / IN | 02 /
JAIN, Rohit 560103 Karnataka / IN | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/35] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 22176216.4 | 30.05.2022 | [2023/35] | Priority number, date | US202217683112 | 28.02.2022 Original published format: US202217683112 | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4235459 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/901, G06Q10/00 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
G06F16/9024 (EP);
G06Q30/0201 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/14] |
Former [2023/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABWANDERUNGSVERHINDERUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON GRAPHEN | [2023/35] | English: | CHURN PREVENTION USING GRAPHS | [2023/35] | French: | PRÉVENTION DE DÉSABONNEMENTS À L'AIDE DE GRAPHES | [2023/35] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/14] | 28.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013279672 (MOHAN SARAVANAN [IN], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract ** figures 1-3 *; | [I]US2017220933 (GONGUET VINCENT [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0064] * |