EP4099491 - BATTERY ASSEMBLY AND ELECTRONIC ATOMIZING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Smoore Technology Limited 2 Floor Building 8 No. 16 Dongcai Industrial Park Gushu Town Xixiang, Baoan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518102 / CN | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIANG, Zhijia Shenzhen, 518102 / CN | 02 /
MING, Zhinan Shenzhen, 518102 / CN | 03 /
SHEN, Pifa Shenzhen, 518102 / CN | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Edificio Aqua - Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2022/49] | De Arpe Tejero, Manuel Arpe Patentes y Marcas Alcalá, 26, 5ª Planta 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 22176446.7 | 31.05.2022 | [2022/49] | Priority number, date | CN202110609740 | 01.06.2021 Original published format: CN202110609740 | [2022/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4099491 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4099491 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/247, A24F40/40, H01M50/262, H01M50/284, H01M10/42, H01R12/70 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
H01M50/247 (EP,US);
A24F40/40 (EP,CN,US);
A24F40/46 (CN);
H01M10/425 (EP);
H01M10/4257 (EP);
H01M50/202 (EP,US);
H01M50/213 (EP);
H01M50/262 (EP,US);
H01M50/284 (EP,US);
H01M2220/30 (EP,US);
H01R12/7041 (EP);
H01R12/718 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/49] | H01M50/247, A24F40/40, H01M50/262, H01M50/284 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] |
Former [2022/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEANORDNUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE ZERSTÄUBUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/49] | English: | BATTERY ASSEMBLY AND ELECTRONIC ATOMIZING DEVICE | [2022/49] | French: | ENSEMBLE BATTERIE ET DISPOSITIF D'ATOMISATION ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2022/49] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/49] | 02.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]TWM548891U (APO INTERNATIONAL CO LTD [TW]) [X] 1-3,5,10 * paragraph [0016]; figures 1-7; claims 1-10 * [A] 6-9 [I] 4; | [XAI]US2020059020 (HAMMERSCHMIED HELMUT [AT], et al) [X] 1-3,5,10 * figures 1-6; claims 1-15 * [A] 6-9 [I] 4; | [A]CN112841732 (SHENZHEN SMOORE TECHNOLOGY LTD) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-14; claims 1-22 *; | [A]CN112841731 (SHENZHEN SMOORE TECHNOLOGY LTD) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-14; claims 1-19 *; | [A]CN112841730 (SHENZHEN SMOORE TECHNOLOGY LTD) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-14; claims 1-21 *; | [XPI]CN113383999 (SHENZHEN SMOORE TECHNOLOGY LTD) [XP] 1-5,10 * the whole document *[I] 6-9 |