EP4099228 - AUTOMATIC LEARNING WITHOUT ANNOTATION IMPROVED BY ADAPTIVE GROUPINGS IN OPEN ASSEMBLY OF CLASSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25 rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUBOURVIEUX, Fabian 91191 GIF-SUR-YVETTE Cedex / FR | 02 /
LOESCH, Angélique 91191 GIF-SUR-YVETTE Cedex / FR | 03 /
AUDIGIER, Romaric 91191 GIF-SUR-YVETTE Cedex / FR | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Atout PI Laplace Immeuble Up On 25 Boulevard Romain Rolland CS 40072 75685 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/49] | Atout PI Laplace Immeuble "Visium" 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 22176506.8 | 31.05.2022 | [2022/49] | Priority number, date | FR20210005890 | 04.06.2021 Original published format: FR 2105890 | [2022/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4099228 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/04, G06N3/08 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
G06N3/088 (EP);
G06N3/045 (EP);
G06N3/084 (EP);
G06N20/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES MASCHINELLES LERNEN OHNE ANMERKUNGEN DURCH ADAPTIVE GRUPPIERUNGEN IN OFFENEN KLASSENSÄTZEN | [2022/49] | English: | AUTOMATIC LEARNING WITHOUT ANNOTATION IMPROVED BY ADAPTIVE GROUPINGS IN OPEN ASSEMBLY OF CLASSES | [2022/49] | French: | APPRENTISSAGE AUTOMATIQUE SANS ANNOTATION AMELIORE PAR REGROUPEMENTS ADAPTATIFS EN ENSEMBLE OUVERT DE CLASSES | [2022/49] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 01.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2019012581 (HONKALA MIKKO [FI], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0086] ** figures 2a-7 *; | [XI]US2020143229 (VAN DER MADE PETER AJ [US], et al) [X] 1,11-15 * paragraph [0130] - paragraph [0163] * * figures 8-16 * [I] 2-10 | by applicant | - ESTER, M., KRIEGEL, H. P., SANDER, J., & XU, X., "A density-based algorithm for discovering clusters in large spatial databases with noise", Kdd, (19960800), vol. 96, no. 34, pages 226 - 231, XP002355949 |