EP4101335 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR FOOT SIZE MEASUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASICS Corporation 1-1, Minatojima-Nakamachi 7-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 650-8555 / JP | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Motoyoshi, Fumiya Hyogo, 650-8555 / JP | 02 /
Tsutsui, Masayuki Hyogo, Hyogo / JP | 03 /
Nakaya, Mai Hyogo, 650-8555 / JP | 04 /
Garavel, Justin Paul Hyogo, 650-8555 / JP | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 22176518.3 | 31.05.2022 | [2022/50] | Priority number, date | JP20210097824 | 11.06.2021 Original published format: JP 2021097824 | [2022/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4101335 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A43D1/02, A61B5/103, A61B5/107 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
A43D1/02 (EP);
A43D1/025 (CN);
A61B5/1074 (EP,US);
A61B5/0077 (EP);
A61B5/1072 (US);
A61B5/1075 (US);
A61B5/1079 (EP,US);
A61B5/6898 (EP);
A61B5/742 (EP);
A61B5/7435 (US);
G06T7/0002 (CN);
G06T7/62 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] |
Former [2022/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DER FUSSGRÖSSE | [2022/50] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR FOOT SIZE MEASUREMENT | [2022/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE LA TAILLE DES PIEDS | [2022/50] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 14.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2019040785 (SHOERETRIEVER INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0065]; figure 6 *; | [XA]KR20200031797 (DEFIND INC [KR]) [X] 1,5,6 * paragraphs [0028] , [0 30] , [ 101]; figure - * [A] 2-4; | [A]US2020178651 (HEI JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * figure - *; | [A]WO2020208298 (RIGHT SIZE COMPANY OY [FI]) [A] 1-6* figure - * | by applicant | JP2019045463 |