EP4098678 - PROCESS FOR MODIFYING ISOCYANATES WITH USE OF DIFLUOROSILICATE SALTS AS CATALYST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trapp, Oliver 81377 München / DE | 02 /
Lucas, Frederic 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
Kraeh, Sabrina 80539 München / DE | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE GBI-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2022/49] | Application number, filing date | 22176534.0 | 31.05.2022 | [2022/49] | Priority number, date | EP20210177339 | 02.06.2021 Original published format: EP 21177339 | [2022/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4098678 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/02, C08G18/73, C07D251/34, C08G18/18 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
C08G18/022 (EP);
C08G18/027 (EP);
C08G18/1875 (EP);
C08G18/1883 (EP);
C08G18/73 (EP);
C08G18/791 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MODIFIZIERUNG VON ISOCYANATEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON DIFLUOROSILIKATSALZEN ALS KATALYSATOR | [2022/49] | English: | PROCESS FOR MODIFYING ISOCYANATES WITH USE OF DIFLUOROSILICATE SALTS AS CATALYST | [2022/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MODIFICATION D'ISOCYANATES UTILISANT DES SELS DE DIFLUOROSILICATE EN TANT QUE CATALYSEUR | [2022/49] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0962455 (BAYER AG [DE]) [AD] 1-14; | [A]US6090939 (RICHTER FRANK [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * claim 1; table 1 *; | [X]US2003135007 (EWALD MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0034]; example 1c *; | [AD]EP2415795 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE]) [AD] 1-14; | [A]US2012035391 (RICHTER FRANK [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * claim 1; table 1 *; | [AD] - Szarek Walter A ET AL, "Utility of Tris(dimethy1amino)sulphonium Difluorotrimethylsilicate (TASF) for the Rapid Synthesis of Deoxyfluoro Sugars", J. CHEM. SOC., CHEM. COMMUN, (1985), URL: https://pubs.rsc.org/en/content/articlepdf/1985/c3/c39850000663, (20221014), XP055971410 [AD] 1-14 * the whole document * | [AD] - ALBANESE D ET AL, "Synthesis of pentacoordinated tetraalkylammonium and tetraalkylphosphonium difluorosilicates", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM , NL, vol. 36, no. 48, doi:10.1016/0040-4039(95)01841-5, ISSN 0040-4039, (19951127), pages 8865 - 8866, (19951127), XP027445870 [AD] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4039(95)01841-5 | by applicant | EP0235388 | EP0295926 | EP0315692 | EP0339396 | EP0379914 | EP0447074 | EP0798299 | EP0896009 | EP0962455 | EP0962454 | EP2415795 | - H. J. LAAS et al., J. Prakt. Chem., (19940000), vol. 336, page 185 | - "Journal of the Chemical Society", Chemical Communications, (19850000), pages 663 - 663 | - Journal of the American Chemical Society, (19950000), vol. 117, pages 5166 - 5166 | - Tetrahedron Letters, (19951127), vol. 36, pages 8865 - 8866 |