EP4099358 - OVERCURRENT PROTECTION DEVICE, PARTICULARLY FOR THE PROTECTION OF SURGE ARRESTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SALTEK s.r.o. Drazdanska 561/85 40007 Usti nad Labem / CZ | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUCHY, Jaromir 40340 Ústí nad Labem - Skorotice / CZ | 02 /
CADEK, Martin 34101 Horazdovice / CZ | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Kratochvil, Vaclav Patent and Trademark Office P.O. Box 26 295 01 Mnichovo Hradiste / CZ | [2022/49] | Application number, filing date | 22176594.4 | 01.06.2022 | [2022/49] | Priority number, date | CZ20210000026 | 01.06.2021 Original published format: CZ 20210026 | [2022/49] | Filing language | CS | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4099358 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01H85/30 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
F03G7/0614 (EP);
H02H9/02 (CZ,US);
F03G7/06 (CZ);
F03G7/06145 (EP);
F03G7/06324 (EP);
F03G7/0633 (EP);
F03G7/0635 (EP);
F16F1/10 (CZ);
F16F1/12 (CZ);
F16F1/127 (CZ);
H01H85/306 (EP);
H02H9/04 (CZ);
H01H2085/0283 (EP);
H01H2085/2085 (US);
H01H85/20 (EP,US);
H01H85/44 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERSTROMSCHUTZEINRICHTUNG, INSBESONDERE ZUM SCHUTZ VON ÜBERSPANNUNGSABLEITERN | [2022/49] | English: | OVERCURRENT PROTECTION DEVICE, PARTICULARLY FOR THE PROTECTION OF SURGE ARRESTERS | [2022/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES SURINTENSITÉS, EN PARTICULIER POUR LA PROTECTION DE PARASURTENSEURS | [2022/49] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2022 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 27.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3621431 (HITCHCOCK PAUL C SR) [X] 1* abstract *; | [XAY]US4387358 (KNAPP JR EDWARD J) [X] 1,2,6 * abstract * [A] 3-5 [Y] 7,8; | [Y]EP0547985 (FERRAZ SA [FR]) [Y] 7,8 * figure 1 * | by applicant | WO9940599 | EP1246212 | CZ299300 | DE102008013447 | US2011013330 | DE102010047244 | WO2012045610 | DE102015204974 | US2016204599 | US2017236674 |