EP4287246 - A METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN INTERCONNECT RAIL FOR CONTACTING A SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE FROM THE BACK SIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imec VZW Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | [2023/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hiblot, Gaspard 3000 Leuven / BE | 02 /
Jourdain, Anne 1390 Grez-Doiceau / BE | 03 /
Van der Plas, Geert 3000 Leuven / BE | [2023/49] | Representative(s) | Patent Department IMEC IMEC vzw Patent Department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | [2023/49] | Application number, filing date | 22176657.9 | 01.06.2022 | [2023/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4287246 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/768, H01L23/528, H01L23/535, H01L29/786 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
H01L21/76897 (EP);
H01L21/743 (EP);
H01L21/76898 (EP);
H01L23/5286 (EP);
H01L23/535 (EP);
H01L29/41733 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM PRODUZIEREN EINER VERBINDUNGSSCHIENE ZUM KONTAKTIEREN EINER HALBLEITERVORRICHTUNG VON DER RÜCKSEITE | [2023/49] | English: | A METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN INTERCONNECT RAIL FOR CONTACTING A SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE FROM THE BACK SIDE | [2023/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN RAIL D'INTERCONNEXION DE CONTACT D'UN DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR À PARTIR DU CÔTÉ ARRIÈRE | [2023/49] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/45] | 28.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2021351079 (SU HUAN-CHIEH [TW], et al) [X] 1-10* paragraphs [0058] - [0063]; figures 24-29 *; | [X]US2021359091 (HSU CHUNG-WEI [TW], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0013] - [0048]; figures 2-19 *; | [X]US2021376093 (CHU LUNG-KUN [TW], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0014] - [0043]; figures 2-17 * | by applicant | EP3035369 | EP3324436 |