EP4286963 - METHOD FOR DECORATING A COMPONENT FOR A TIMEPIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Manufacture d'Horlogerie Audemars Piguet SA Route de France 16 1348 Le Brassus / CH | [2023/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ponsot, Nicolas 1273 Arzier-Le Muids / CH | [2023/49] | Representative(s) | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Avenue J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2023/49] | Application number, filing date | 22177156.1 | 03.06.2022 | [2023/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4286963 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G04B19/06, G04B45/02, G04D3/00, G04B29/02, G04B5/16 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
G04D3/0092 (EP);
G04B19/06 (EP);
G04B29/027 (EP);
G04B45/02 (EP);
G04B19/042 (EP);
G04B5/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERZIEREN EINES BAUTEILS FÜR EINE UHR | [2023/49] | English: | METHOD FOR DECORATING A COMPONENT FOR A TIMEPIECE | [2023/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCORATION D'UN COMPOSANT POUR PIÈCE D'HORLOGERIE | [2023/49] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0098795 (RADO MONTRES SA [CH]) [A] 1-11 * figure 1 *; | [A]CH703229 (BAUMGARTNER PATRICK [CH]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [XAI]CH717065 (ANTHONY AMATO [CH]) [X] 9-11 * figures 2-6C * * paragraphs [0010] , [0 11] * * paragraphs [0039] - [0041] * * paragraphs [0046] - [0053] * * paragraphs [0057] - [0061] * [A] 8 [I] 1-7 | by applicant | CH711122 | EP3220212 |