EP4091755 - INDUCTION DEVICES AND METHODS OF USING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Perkinelmer Health Sciences Inc. 940 Winter Street Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEUNG, Tak Shun Ontario, M1V 3N9 / CA | 02 /
WONG, Chui Ha Cindy Ontario, L6C 3C4 / CA | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | West, Jonathan David Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 22177648.7 | 23.01.2015 | [2022/47] | Priority number, date | US201461932418P | 28.01.2014 Original published format: US 201461932418 P | [2022/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4091755 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B23K10/00, H05H1/30, H01J49/10, H01J49/26, H05H1/32, H05H1/34 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
H05H1/30 (EP,US);
H05H1/32 (US);
H01J49/105 (US);
H01J49/26 (US);
H05H1/3405 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] |
Former [2022/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | INDUKTIONSVORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2022/47] | English: | INDUCTION DEVICES AND METHODS OF USING THEM | [2022/47] | French: | DISPOSITIFS D'INDUCTION ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2022/47] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 23.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.03.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/16] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15742837.6 / EP3099443 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS5839005 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 13-15 * figures 1-2 * * page 17, column l - page 18, column r *; | [XYI]JPS6320400U (SHUNICHI SAKARAGI) [X] 1-3,6-8 * figures 1-4 * * page 1 - page 6 * [Y] 13-15 [I] 9-12; | [A]WO2007027784 (PERKINELMER INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15* figures 8-11 * |