EP4101309 - MACHINE FOR PROCESSING LIQUID OR SEMI-LIQUID FOOD PRODUCTS AND METHOD FOR FOOD PROCESSING A BASE FOOD MIXTURE IN SAID MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ali Group S.r.l. - Carpigiani Via Gobetti 2/A 20063 Cernusco sul Naviglio, Milano / IT | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAZZARINI, Roberto 42100 REGGIO EMILIA / IT | 02 /
TASSI, Federico 40122 BOLOGNA / IT | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Milli, Simone Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 22178052.1 | 09.06.2022 | [2022/50] | Priority number, date | IT20210015389 | 11.06.2021 Original published format: IT202100015389 | [2022/50] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4101309 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4101309 | Date: | 16.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A23G9/04, A23G9/08, A23G9/22, A23G9/28 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
A23G9/08 (EP);
F25B49/02 (CN,US);
A23G9/12 (US);
A23G9/045 (EP);
A23G9/22 (EP);
A23G9/225 (US);
A23G9/228 (EP);
A23G9/28 (EP);
A23G9/281 (EP);
F25B39/02 (CN,US);
F25B39/04 (CN);
F25B41/40 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] |
Former [2022/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MASCHINE ZUM VERARBEITEN VON FLÜSSIGEN ODER HALBFLÜSSIGEN LEBENSMITTELN UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERARBEITEN EINER LEBENSMITTELGRUNDMISCHUNG IN DIESER MASCHINE. | [2022/50] | English: | MACHINE FOR PROCESSING LIQUID OR SEMI-LIQUID FOOD PRODUCTS AND METHOD FOR FOOD PROCESSING A BASE FOOD MIXTURE IN SAID MACHINE | [2022/50] | French: | MACHINE DE TRAITEMENT DE PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES LIQUIDES OU SEMI-LIQUIDES ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'UN MÉLANGE ALIMENTAIRE DE BASE DANS LADITE MACHINE | [2022/50] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | 09.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]ITUB20150731 (ALI GROUP SRL CARPIGIANI ); | [A]US2017105427 (COCCHI ANDREA [IT], et al); | [Y]EP3360421 (CARPIGIANI GROUP ALI SPA [IT]); | [Y]US10952456 (COCCHI ANDREA [IT], et al) |